Ewalan v. State of Washington
Petitioner: Joseph Lochuch Ewalan
Respondent: State of Washington
Case Number: 2:2020cv01497
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The Certification section on the second page of the IFP must be completed and certified by the facility where you are currently housed. A copy of the IFP form is enclosed.- The trust account statement must include transactions for the last six months. Please resubmit an updated statement. Filer has until 11/13/2020 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joseph Ewalan, Prisoner ID: 392824)(ST)
October 14, 2020 NOTICE re #3 IFP Deficiency Letter. Additional deficiency discovered. Original deadline terminated. Please abide by deadline in #4 Deficiency letter. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joseph Ewalan, Prisoner ID: 392824)(ST)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; -The Certification section of the Application is incomplete. Please have the institution fully complete the Certification section on the enclosed application. A copy of the completed IFP form must be returned to the Court by the deadline indicated in this letter. Filer has until 11/12/2020 to correct. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joseph Ewalan, Prisoner ID: 392824)(ST)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Joseph Lochuch Ewalan. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit, #3 Brief in Support of Petition, #4 PROPOSED Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #5 Prison Trust Account)**62 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joseph Ewalan, Prisoner ID: 392824)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ewalan v. State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Lochuch Ewalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?