Neuro Science Technologies LLC v. Farwell
Plaintiff: Neuro Science Technologies LLC
Defendant: Lawrence A Farwell
Arbitrator: Randy M Boyer
Intervenor Defendant: Brett Wieburg
Case Number: 2:2020cv01554
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 MINUTE ENTRY: Pursuant to the Court's order in case 2:20-mc-0009 RSL to assign a new civil case number, the case has been randomly assigned to the Hon. Thomas S Zilly, case number 2:20-cv-1554. All future pleading must bear the newly assigned case number. (CDA)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. In light of the contested nature of this proceeding, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign a civil action number. (CDA)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDMENT Amended Response to #8 Response to Motion, #9 Response to Motion, #5 MOTION to Intervene by Defendant Lawrence A Farwell (Farwell, Lawrence)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE, by Defendant Lawrence A Farwell, to #4 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Brett Michael Wieburg added to party Brett Wieburg(pty:intvd), #1 MOTION, #5 MOTION to Intervene . Oral Argument Requested. (Farwell, Lawrence)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE, by Defendant Lawrence A Farwell, to #5 MOTION to Intervene . (Farwell, Lawrence)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE: Defendant Lawrence A Farwell has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. The party was directed to enter their appearance in accordance with LCR 83.2. (STP)
September 21, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #4 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Brett Michael Wieburg added to party Brett Wieburg(pty:intvd) : Corrected to reflect this is a proposed order.(CDA)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Paul Tomkins filed by Intervenor Defendant Brett Wieburg re #4 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Brett Michael Wieburg added to party Brett Wieburg(pty:intvd), #5 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Wieburg, Brett)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene , filed by Intervenor Defendant Brett Wieburg. Noting Date 10/23/2020, (Wieburg, Brett)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER re #5 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Brett Michael Wieburg added to party Brett Wieburg(pty:intvd), filed by Intervenor Defendant Brett Wieburg. Noting Date 10/23/2020, (Wieburg, Brett) Modified on 9/21/2020 entry is a proposed order (CDA).
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (CDA)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 JUDGMENT ON ARBITRATION BY STIPULATION by Judge Robert S. Lasnik (CDA)
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award by Stipulation, filed by Arbitrator Randy M Boyer. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Judgment on Arbitration by Stipulation, #2 Email transmittal) (FEE PAID #SEA099965)(CDA) Modified on 2/12/2020 correct typo (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neuro Science Technologies LLC v. Farwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Arbitrator: Randy M Boyer
Represented By: Randy M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neuro Science Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence A Farwell
Represented By: Lawrence A Farwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Brett Wieburg
Represented By: Brett Michael Wieburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?