Petitt v. Air Line Pilots Association
Plaintiff: Karlene K Petitt
Defendant: Airline Pilots Association and Air Line Pilots Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv01569
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Referring Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Modify Scheduling Order, filed by Defendant Air Line Pilots Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/4/2021, (Iglitzin, Dmitri)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 1/6/2021, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail) (KERR) Modified on 12/9/2020 (KERR).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik for all further proceedings. All future documents filed in this case must bear cause numbers ending in RSL and must bear the new Judge's name in the upper right-hand corner of the document. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via USPS
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-1093, by Defendant Air Line Pilots Association. (Iglitzin, Dmitri)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dmitri Iglitzin on behalf of Defendant Air Line Pilots Association. (Iglitzin, Dmitri)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Airline Pilots Association with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) not received to issue) (Receipt # SEA102340), filed by Karlene K Petitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Email transmittal)(CDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petitt v. Air Line Pilots Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airline Pilots Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Line Pilots Association
Represented By: Dmitri Iglitzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karlene K Petitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?