Mobiloc LLC v. Neutron Holdings Inc
Plaintiff: Mobiloc LLC
Defendant: Neutron Holdings Inc doing business as Lime
Counter Claimant: Neutron Holdings Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01570
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mark Hogge for defendant Neutron Holdings Inc by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin R Greenleaf for defendant Neutron Holdings Inc by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Katherine Ramlose McMorrow for Defendant Neutron Holdings Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jennifer D Bennett for Defendant Neutron Holdings Inc by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Attorney Kenneth Ray Davis, II added for Neutron Holdings Inc; per #19 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Neutron Holdings Inc for Neutron Holdings Inc, Neutron Holdings Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Neutron Holdings Inc (Adamson, Joseph)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Mobiloc LLC by Neutron Holdings Inc.(Adamson, Joseph)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jennifer D Bennett FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Neutron Holdings Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6805131 (Adamson, Joseph)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mark L Hogge FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Neutron Holdings Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6805101 (Adamson, Joseph)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Katherine R McMorrow FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Neutron Holdings Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6805094 (Adamson, Joseph)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin Greenleaf FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Neutron Holdings Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6805086 (Adamson, Joseph)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph D Adamson on behalf of Defendant Neutron Holdings Inc. (Adamson, Joseph)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Barbara J Duffy on behalf of Defendant Neutron Holdings Inc. (Duffy, Barbara)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/11/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/18/2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant Neutron Holdings, Inc., dba LIME, shall move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint filed in the above-captioned action on or before December 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , filed by Plaintiff Mobiloc LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint) Noting Date 11/10/2020, (Breaux, Diana)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER FOR PATENT CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anthony E Dowell for Plaintiff Mobiloc LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lauren O Devereux for Plaintiff Mobiloc LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Greg N Geiser for Plaintiff Mobiloc LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Neutron Holdings Inc. (RE)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (RE)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (RE)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EXHIBIT 1 to Complaint for Patent Infringement re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Mobiloc LLC (Breaux, Diana)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lauren O. Devereaux FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Mobiloc LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6689650 (Breaux, Diana)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Greg N. Geiser FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Mobiloc LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6689649 (Breaux, Diana)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anthony E. Dowell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Mobiloc LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6689647 (Breaux, Diana)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mobiloc LLC (Breaux, Diana)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Mobiloc LLC (Breaux, Diana)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT re #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Plaintiff Mobiloc LLC (Breaux, Diana)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Mobiloc LLC. (Breaux, Diana)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against defendant(s) Mobiloc LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6689619) Attorney Diana S Breaux added to party Mobiloc LLC(pty:pla), filed by Mobiloc LLC.(Breaux, Diana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobiloc LLC v. Neutron Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neutron Holdings Inc doing business as Lime
Represented By: Katherine Ramlose McMorrow
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Represented By: Mark Hogge
Represented By: Kevin R Greenleaf
Represented By: Jennifer D Bennett
Represented By: Joseph D Adamson
Represented By: Kenneth Ray Davis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobiloc LLC
Represented By: Philip S McCune
Represented By: Diana S Breaux
Represented By: Greg N Geiser
Represented By: Lauren O Devereux
Represented By: Anthony E Dowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Neutron Holdings Inc
Represented By: Barbara J Duffy
Represented By: Mark Hogge
Represented By: Kevin R Greenleaf
Represented By: Jennifer D Bennett
Represented By: Joseph D Adamson
Represented By: Kenneth Ray Davis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?