Muita et al v. Munita et al
Plaintiff: Philip Mwangi Karanja and Damaris Wakonyo Muita
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Chad F Wolf, James McHenry, Cynthia Munita and William P Barr
Case Number: 2:2020cv01582
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to All Defendants on 11/2/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Philip Mwangi Karanja, Damaris Wakonyo Muita. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts and Two Return Receipts, #2 USPS Delivery Confirmation for other mailings)(Theriot-Orr, Devin)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(SG)
October 29, 2020 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (SG)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) William P Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, James McHenry, Cynthia Munita, Chad F Wolf (Receipt # AWAWDC-6699895) Attorney Devin T Theriot-Orr added to party Philip Mwangi Karanja(pty:pla), Attorney Devin T Theriot-Orr added to party Damaris Wakonyo Muita(pty:pla), filed by Philip Mwangi Karanja, Damaris Wakonyo Muita. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Theriot-Orr, Devin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muita et al v. Munita et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Mwangi Karanja
Represented By: Devin T Theriot-Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damaris Wakonyo Muita
Represented By: Devin T Theriot-Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Munita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?