Celebration IP LLC v. Monolithic Power Systems Inc
Plaintiff: Celebration IP LLC
Defendant: Monolithic Power Systems, Inc and Monolithic Power Systems Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01589
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 12/14/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/7/2020. (LC)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Celebration IP LLC (Mann, Philip)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Monolithic Power Systems Inc. (RE)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (RE)
October 30, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Celebration IP LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/6/2020. (RE)
October 30, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against defendant(s) Monolithic Power Systems, Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6702708) Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Celebration IP LLC(pty:pla), filed by Celebration IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #5 Summons)(Mann, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celebration IP LLC v. Monolithic Power Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celebration IP LLC
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monolithic Power Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monolithic Power Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?