Cutting Edge Vision LLC v. HTC Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Cutting Edge Vision, LLC and Cutting Edge Vision LLC
Defendant: HTC America Inc and HTC Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01618
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation (Kirkbaumer, Ross)
December 18, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson, re: #25 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order.(TF)
December 17, 2020 Filing 25 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order, filed by Plaintiff Cutting Edge Vision LLC. (Vecchio, Daniel)
December 16, 2020 Filing 24 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sean D. Flaherty FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6811899 (Kirkbaumer, Ross)
December 16, 2020 Filing 23 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lara S. Garner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6811621 (Kirkbaumer, Ross)
December 15, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ross Garrett Kirkbaumer on behalf of Defendants HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation. (Kirkbaumer, Ross)
December 1, 2020 Upon the request of the parties, and with good cause, the Court resets the following deadlines: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is now due 12/21/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/4/2021, Joint Status Report will be due by 1/11/2021. (TF)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eamon P Kelly for Plaintiff Cutting Edge Vision LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven G Lisa for Plaintiff Cutting Edge Vision LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/7/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/21/2020, by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TF)
November 16, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and Amended General Order 02-19. (TF)
November 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Antoine M McNamara on behalf of Defendants HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation. (McNamara, Antoine)
November 12, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/19/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson, re: #14 Stipulation; HTC Corporation answer due 2/8/2021.(TF)
November 9, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re Extension for Response by parties (Vecchio, Daniel)
November 9, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons (Vecchio, Daniel)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Justin Lesko for plaintiff Cutting Edge Vision LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 4, 2020 Filing 11 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) HTC America Inc, HTC Corporation (Attachments: #1 Summons- HTC Corp)(RE)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (RE)
November 4, 2020 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (RE)
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cutting Edge Vision, LLC (Vecchio, Daniel)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven Lisa FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Cutting Edge Vision, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6714044 (Vecchio, Daniel)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Justin Lesko FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Cutting Edge Vision, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6714000 (Vecchio, Daniel)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eamon Kelly FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Cutting Edge Vision, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6713979 (Vecchio, Daniel)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT re #1 Complaint for Patent Infringement by Plaintiff Cutting Edge Vision, LLC (Vecchio, Daniel)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint for Patent Infringement by Plaintiff Cutting Edge Vision, LLC (Vecchio, Daniel)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint for Patent Infringement by Plaintiff Cutting Edge Vision, LLC (Vecchio, Daniel)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Cutting Edge Vision, LLC. (Vecchio, Daniel)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6713575), filed by Cutting Edge Vision, LLC.(Vecchio, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cutting Edge Vision LLC v. HTC Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cutting Edge Vision, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J Vecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cutting Edge Vision LLC
Represented By: Daniel J Vecchio
Represented By: Steven G Lisa
Represented By: Justin Lesko
Represented By: Eamon P Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Inc
Represented By: Antoine M McNamara
Represented By: Ross Garrett Kirkbaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Represented By: Antoine M McNamara
Represented By: Ross Garrett Kirkbaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?