Shaw et al v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Thomas McCarthy and Bradley Shaw
Defendant: Schell & Kampeter Inc doing business as Diamond Pet Foods Inc and Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01620
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Upon the joint request of the parties and for good cause shown, the Court extends the following deadlines: Deadlines for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is 2/15/2021. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/26/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/12/2021, Joint Status Report due by 3/26/2021. (VE)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John Hunter Bryson for Plaintiffs Thomas McCarthy and Bradley Shaw, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David T Biderman for Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, and Schell & Kampeter Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 10, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David T. Biderman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Schell & Kampeter Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6797550 (O'Sullivan, Kathleen)
December 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marten N King on behalf of Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Schell & Kampeter Inc. (King, Marten)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/22/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/29/2020, Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2021, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
December 8, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Schell & Kampeter Inc (O'Sullivan, Kathleen)
December 8, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation (O'Sullivan, Kathleen)
December 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kathleen M O'Sullivan on behalf of Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Schell & Kampeter Inc. (O'Sullivan, Kathleen)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Schell & Kampeter, Inc. d/b/a Diamond Pet Foods, Inc. on 11/5/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Thomas McCarthy, Bradley Shaw. (Terrell, Beth)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Costco Wholesale Corporation on 11/9/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Thomas McCarthy, Bradley Shaw. (Terrell, Beth)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nick Suciu, III for plaintiffs Thomas McCarthy and Bradley Shaw, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Arthur Stock for plaintiffs Thomas McCarthy and Bradley Shaw, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lisa A White for plaintiffs Thomas McCarthy and Bradley Shaw, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY J. Hunter Bryson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Thomas McCarthy, Bradley Shaw (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6715884 (Terrell, Beth)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nick Suciu, III FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Thomas McCarthy, Bradley Shaw (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6715880 (Terrell, Beth)
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Arthur Stock FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Thomas McCarthy, Bradley Shaw (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6715874 (Terrell, Beth)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lisa A. White FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Thomas McCarthy, Bradley Shaw (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6715872 (Terrell, Beth)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MET)
November 4, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 20-6078 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Seattle case number. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 20-1620 RAJ. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (MET)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) against defendant(s) Costco Wholesale Corporation, Schell & Kampeter, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6713353) Attorney Beth E Terrell added to party Thomas McCarthy(pty:pla), Attorney Beth E Terrell added to party Bradley Shaw(pty:pla), filed by Bradley Shaw, Thomas McCarthy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Costco Wholesale Corporation, #3 Summons Schell & Kampeter, Inc.)(Terrell, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw et al v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schell & Kampeter Inc doing business as Diamond Pet Foods Inc
Represented By: David T Biderman
Represented By: Kathleen M O'Sullivan
Represented By: Marten N King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: David T Biderman
Represented By: Kathleen M O'Sullivan
Represented By: Marten N King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas McCarthy
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Ryan Tack-Hooper
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Benjamin Drachler
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: John Hunter Bryson
Represented By: Arthur Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Shaw
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Ryan Tack-Hooper
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Benjamin Drachler
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: John Hunter Bryson
Represented By: Arthur Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?