Klein et al v Kim
Plaintiff: Josh Klein and Covalence Capital LLC
Defendant: Douglas Jae Woo Kim
Case Number: 2:2020cv01628
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: At the parties' telephonic request, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 2/8/2021, FRCP 26(f) 1/27/21, FRCP 26(a)(1) 2/3/21. Failure to adhere to this deadline may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Prior 12/10/20 entry entered in error by courtroom deputy. This order assigns correct extensions and deadlines. Signed by Judge Barbara J Rothstein Modified on 12/15/2020 (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/15/2020) Modified on 12/15/2020 (GC).
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order DISREGARD MINUTE ORDER: At the parties' telephonic request, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 1/12/2021. Failure to adhere to this deadline may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Barbara J Rothstein. (GC) Modified on 12/15/2020 (GC).
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' #9 Stipulated Motion regarding Service of Process and Extending Time for Responsive Pleading. The deadline for Defendant's responsive pleading shall be January 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LH)
December 9, 2020 Filing 10 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Covalence Capital LLC (Wolf, Daniel Charles)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION regarding Service of Process and Extending Time for Responsive Pleading, filed by Plaintiff Covalence Capital LLC. Noting Date 12/8/2020, (Wolf, Daniel Charles)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Cedric Goodman on behalf of Defendant Douglas Jae Woo Kim. (Goodman, Robert)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/11/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/18/2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Josh Klein, Other Affiliate Nabil Manji, Other Affiliate William Janeway-Wright for Covalence Capital LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Covalence Capital LLC, Josh Klein (Wolf, Daniel Charles)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael D McKay on behalf of Plaintiffs Covalence Capital LLC, Josh Klein. (McKay, Michael)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Douglas Jae Woo Kim (ST)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ST)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ST)
November 6, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff Convalence Capital LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/13/2020. (ST)
November 6, 2020 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (ST)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract and Fraud against defendant(s) Douglas Jae Woo Kim with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6717843) Attorney Daniel Charles V. Wolf added to party Covalence Capital LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Charles V. Wolf added to party Josh Klein(pty:pla), filed by Josh Klein, Covalence Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wolf, Daniel Charles) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/6/2020) (ST). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2020: #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K) (ST). Modified on 11/6/2020. Complaint was filed with exhibits attached. Separated complaint from exhibits and replaced/posted.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein et al v Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Jae Woo Kim
Represented By: Robert Cedric Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Klein
Represented By: Daniel Charles V. Wolf
Represented By: Michael D McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Covalence Capital LLC
Represented By: Daniel Charles V. Wolf
Represented By: Michael D McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?