United States of America v. Richey
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Eric Richey
Case Number: 2:2020cv01695
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Receipt re #4 Decree ; filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Bohl, Nickolas)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Eric Richey mailed on 12/30/2020 (Bohl, Nickolas)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT DECREE AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (MW)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/19/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/25/2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
November 18, 2020 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (RE)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Eric Richey, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Order)(Bohl, Nickolas) (No Fee Required)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nickolas Bohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?