Realm Licensing LLC v. Smartsheet Inc
Plaintiff: Realm Licensing LLC
Defendant: Smartsheet Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01759
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Realm Licensing LLC (Mann, Philip)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, AND EARLY SETTLEMENT IN A PATENT CASE: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/19/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/2/2021, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 2/2/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SG)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Smartsheet Inc (SG)
December 1, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SG)
December 1, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/8/2020. (SG)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against defendant(s) Smartsheet Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6771228) Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Realm Licensing LLC(pty:pla), filed by Realm Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #9 Summons)(Mann, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Realm Licensing LLC v. Smartsheet Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Realm Licensing LLC
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smartsheet Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?