Gross et al v. Aqua-Chem Inc et al
Plaintiff: Earl K Gross and Nancy E Gross
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney, ZF Marine Propulsion Systems Miramar LLC, Crane Co, Carrier Corporation, Aqua-Chem Inc, Markey Machinery Co Inc and Cleaver-Brooks Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01777
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Reset Deadline: The parties' #45 Stipulated MOTION to Amend Order Setting Trial Date and Related Deadlines is GRANTED. Expert/Witness Disclosure Reports Under FRCP 26(a)(2) due 8/12/2021. The trial date and all other pretrial deadlines previously set remain unchanged. (VE)
June 29, 2021 Filing 45 Stipulated MOTION to Amend Order Setting Trial Date and Related Deadlines, filed by Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross. Noting Date 6/29/2021, (Olson, Justin)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re #42 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Harold Hunter for Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, and Nancy E Gross, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 2, 2021 Filing 43 PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe to Attached Document) re #42 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross (Olson, Justin)
June 2, 2021 Filing 42 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Harold Hunter FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross (Fee Paid) Receipt No. BWAWDC-7107552 (Olson, Justin)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 10-12 days. JURY TRIAL is set for 1/18/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 6/11/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/22/2021, Discovery completed by 9/20/2021, Dispositive motions and motions challenging expert witness testimony due by 10/20/2021, Motions in Limine due by 12/21/2021, Pretrial Order due by 1/4/2022, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 1/11/2022, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
March 3, 2021 Filing 40 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 12. Filed by Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross.(Bergman, Matthew)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Stipulated MOTION of Dismissal as to Defendant Carrier Corporation Only, signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. All of Plaintiffs' claims against Carrier Corporation only are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs as to any party. (VE)
February 17, 2021 Filing 38 Stipulated MOTION of Dismissal as to Defendant Carrier Corporation Only, filed by Defendant Carrier Corporation. (Uhle, Megan)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/16/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/22/2021, Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2021, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
January 29, 2021 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pratt & Whitney (Street, Jennifer)
January 29, 2021 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND Attorney Jennifer Street added to party Pratt & Whitney(pty:dft) by Pratt & Whitney.(Street, Jennifer)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #33 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel Michael Finer for Defendant Carrier Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 20, 2021 Filing 33 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel Finer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Carrier Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6886228 (Uhle, Megan) Local Counsel maintains an office in both Seattle, WA and Portland, OR 1/20/2021 (DS).
January 19, 2021 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ZF North America, Inc. for ZF Marine Propulsion Systems Miramar LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ZF Marine Propulsion Systems Miramar LLC (Scharer, Karleen)
January 13, 2021 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Crane Co (Shaw, G)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT AQUA-CHEM, INC., signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. The parties' #29 MOTION Stipulation and Order of Dismissal of Defendant Aqua-Chem, Inc. is granted. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Aqua-Chem, Inc., only, are dismissed without prejudice and without costs or attorney fees as to any party. (VE)
January 13, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION Stipulation and Order of Dismissal of Defendant Aqua-Chem, Inc., filed by Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross. (Olson, Justin)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice of Defendant Markey Machinery Co., Inc., signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Markey Machinery Co., Inc., only are dismissed without prejudice and without costs to any party, reserving the Plaintiff's claims against all other parties. (VE)
January 11, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Markey Machinery Co., Inc. by parties (Williams, Molly)
January 8, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin J Craig on behalf of Defendant Aqua-Chem Inc. (Craig, Kevin)
December 31, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Molly McKay Williams on behalf of Defendant Markey Machinery Co Inc. (Williams, Molly)
December 28, 2020 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cleaver-Brooks Inc (Craig, Kevin)
December 28, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Cleaver-Brooks Inc.(Craig, Kevin)
December 28, 2020 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Carrier Global Corporation for Carrier Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Carrier Corporation (Uhle, Megan)
December 28, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND by Carrier Corporation.(Uhle, Megan)
December 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin J Craig on behalf of Defendant Cleaver-Brooks Inc. (Craig, Kevin)
December 18, 2020 Attorney Katherine M. Steele added for ZF Marine Propulsion Systems Miramar LLC; per #19 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
December 18, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Karleen Joy Scharer on behalf of Defendant ZF Marine Propulsion Systems Miramar LLC. (Scharer, Karleen)
December 17, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Carrier Corporation on 12/7/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross. (Olson, Justin)
December 17, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Carrier Global Corporation for Carrier Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Carrier Corporation (MacKenzie, Nicole)
December 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nicole R. MacKenzie on behalf of Defendant Carrier Corporation. (MacKenzie, Nicole)
December 17, 2020 Attorney Megan Uhle added for Carrier Corporation; per #16 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
December 16, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on ZF Marine Propulsion Systems Miramar, LLC on 12/7/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross. (Olson, Justin)
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Pratt & Whitney on 12/10/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross. (Olson, Justin)
December 16, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Markey Machinery Co., Inc. on 12/7/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross. (Olson, Justin)
December 16, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Crane Co. on 12/7/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross. (Olson, Justin)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. on 12/8/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross. (Olson, Justin)
December 16, 2020 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT IS BLANK*** AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Carrier Corporation on 12/7/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross. (Olson, Justin) Modified on 12/17/2020 (MW).
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Aqua-Chem, Inc. on 12/8/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross. (Olson, Justin)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Crane Co.(Shaw, G)
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney G William Shaw on behalf of Defendant Crane Co. (Shaw, G)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew Phineas Bergman on behalf of Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross. (Bergman, Matthew)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Justin Olson on behalf of Plaintiffs Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross. (Olson, Justin)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(MET)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MET)
December 3, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: ***Case Terminated-Incorrect Division*** Civil case number 20-6175 has been terminated. The incorrect divisional office was selected by the filer upon case opening. This case has now been assigned a Seattle case number. All future filings shall bear the following case number: 20-1777 RAJ. Before initiating a new case, please review the #Attorney Case Opening Guide (PDF) to determine the correct divisional jurisdiction. (MET)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Personal Injuries against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6777966), filed by Earl K Gross, Nancy E Gross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Aqua-Chem, #3 Summons Summons to Carrier Corporation, #4 Summons Summons to Cleaver-Brooks, #5 Summons Summons to Crane Co., #6 Summons Summons to Markey Machinery, #7 Summons Summons to Pratt & Whitney, #8 Summons ZF Marine Propulsion Systems)(Olson, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gross et al v. Aqua-Chem Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney
Represented By: Jennifer Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF Marine Propulsion Systems Miramar LLC
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: G William Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Represented By: Daniel Michael Finer
Represented By: Nicole R. MacKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aqua-Chem Inc
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markey Machinery Co Inc
Represented By: Molly McKay Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Inc
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl K Gross
Represented By: Justin Olson
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Represented By: Harold Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy E Gross
Represented By: Justin Olson
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Represented By: Harold Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?