Colacurcio et al v. Insight Venture Partners VII LP et al
Plaintiff: James McMurchie, David Hanson, Maris Hanson and Patrick Colacurcio
Defendant: Insight Venture Associates VII, Ltd., Insight Holding Group, LLC, Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII, L.P., Insight Venture Management, LLC, Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II, L.P., Insight Venture Partners VII, L.P., Ryan Hinkle, Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII, L.P., Insight Venture Associates VII, L.P., Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II, L.P., Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors), L.P., Insight Venture Associates VII LP, Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors) LP, Insight Holding Group LLC, Insight Venture Management LLC, Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II LP, Insight Venture Partners VII LP, Insight Venture Associates VII Ltd, Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II LP, Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII LP and Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII LP
Case Number: 2:2020cv01856
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER RE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez: Motion due by 4/29/2021, Response due by 5/28/2021, Reply due by 6/11/2021. (LC)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 10. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Dennett, Jason)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Randall Jackson for Defendant Ryan Hinkle, Insight Holding Group LLC, Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II LP, Insight Venture Associates VII LP, Insight Venture Associates VII Ltd, Insight Venture Management LLC, Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II LP, Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors) LP, and for Insight Venture Partners VII LP, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Margot Gianis Mooney for Defendants Ryan Hinkle, Insight Holding Group LLC, Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II LP, Insight Venture Associates VII LP, Insight Venture Associates VII Ltd, Insight Venture Management LLC, Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II LP, Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors) LP, and Insight Venture Partners VII LP, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles Dean Cording for Defendants Ryan Hinkle Insight Holding Group LLC, Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II LP, Insight Venture Associates VII LP, Insight Venture Associates VII Ltd, Insight Venture Management LLC, Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II LP, Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors) LP, and Insight Venture Partners VII LP, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey Korn for Defendants Insight Holding Group LLC, Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II LP, Insight Venture Associates VII LP, Insight Venture Associates VII Ltd, Insight Venture Management LLC, Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II LP, Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors) LP, and Insight Venture Partners VII LP, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Randall Jackson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Ryan Hinkle, Insight Holding Group LLC, Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II LP, Insight Venture Associates VII LP, Insight Venture Associates VII Ltd, Insight Venture Management LLC, Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II LP, Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors) LP, Insight Venture Partners VII LP (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6856015 (Tondini, John)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Margot G. Mooney FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Ryan Hinkle, Insight Holding Group LLC, Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II LP, Insight Venture Associates VII LP, Insight Venture Associates VII Ltd, Insight Venture Management LLC, Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II LP, Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors) LP, Insight Venture Partners VII LP (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6856009 (Tondini, John)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles D. Cording FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Ryan Hinkle, Insight Holding Group LLC, Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II LP, Insight Venture Associates VII LP, Insight Venture Associates VII Ltd, Insight Venture Management LLC, Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II LP, Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors) LP, Insight Venture Partners VII LP (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6856000 (Tondini, John)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey B. Korn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Ryan Hinkle, Insight Holding Group LLC, Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II LP, Insight Venture Associates VII LP, Insight Venture Associates VII Ltd, Insight Venture Management LLC, Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II LP, Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors) LP, Insight Venture Partners VII LP (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6855996 (Tondini, John)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants Ryan Hinkle, Insight Holding Group LLC, Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II LP, Insight Venture Associates VII LP, Insight Venture Associates VII Ltd, Insight Venture Management LLC, Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII LP, Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II LP, Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors) LP, Insight Venture Partners VII LP (Tondini, John)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 2/17/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/3/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/10/2021. (LC)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SG)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ryan Hinkle, Insight Holding Group, LLC, Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II, L.P., Insight Venture Associates VII, L.P., Insight Venture Associates VII, Ltd., Insight Venture Management, LLC, Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII, L.P., Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII, L.P., Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II, L.P., Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors), L.P., Insight Venture Partners VII, L.P. (Tondini, John)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-33469-0-SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6836234) Attorney John Arthur Tondini added to party Ryan Hinkle(pty:dft), Attorney John Arthur Tondini added to party Insight Holding Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Arthur Tondini added to party Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney John Arthur Tondini added to party Insight Venture Associates VII, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney John Arthur Tondini added to party Insight Venture Associates VII, Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney John Arthur Tondini added to party Insight Venture Management, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Arthur Tondini added to party Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney John Arthur Tondini added to party Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney John Arthur Tondini added to party Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney John Arthur Tondini added to party Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors), L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney John Arthur Tondini added to party Insight Venture Partners VII, L.P.(pty:dft), filed by Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors), L.P., Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII, L.P., Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II, L.P., Insight Venture Associates VII, Ltd., Insight Venture Partners VII, L.P., Insight Holding Group, LLC, Ryan Hinkle, Insight Venture Management, LLC, Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII, L.P., Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II, L.P., Insight Venture Associates VII, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tondini, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colacurcio et al v. Insight Venture Partners VII LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Associates VII, Ltd.
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Holding Group, LLC
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII, L.P.
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Management, LLC
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II, L.P.
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Partners VII, L.P.
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Hinkle
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Represented By: Margot Gianis Mooney
Represented By: Randall Jackson
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII, L.P.
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Associates VII, L.P.
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II, L.P.
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors), L.P.
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Associates VII LP
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Represented By: Margot Gianis Mooney
Represented By: Randall Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Korn
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Partners VII (Co-Investors) LP
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Represented By: Margot Gianis Mooney
Represented By: Randall Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Korn
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Holding Group LLC
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Represented By: Margot Gianis Mooney
Represented By: Randall Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Korn
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Management LLC
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Represented By: Margot Gianis Mooney
Represented By: Randall Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Korn
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Partners Coinvestment Fund II LP
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Represented By: Margot Gianis Mooney
Represented By: Randall Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Korn
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Partners VII LP
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Represented By: Margot Gianis Mooney
Represented By: Randall Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Korn
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Associates VII Ltd
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Represented By: Margot Gianis Mooney
Represented By: Randall Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Korn
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Associates Coinvestment II LP
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Represented By: Margot Gianis Mooney
Represented By: Randall Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Korn
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) VII LP
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Represented By: Margot Gianis Mooney
Represented By: Randall Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Korn
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) VII LP
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: John Arthur Tondini
Represented By: Margot Gianis Mooney
Represented By: Randall Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey Korn
Represented By: Charles Dean Cording
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McMurchie
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Kaleigh N.B. Powell
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Cecily C Shiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hanson
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Kaleigh N.B. Powell
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Cecily C Shiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maris Hanson
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Kaleigh N.B. Powell
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Cecily C Shiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Colacurcio
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Kaleigh N.B. Powell
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Cecily C Shiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?