In re: Frank William Birkholz
In Re: Frank W Birkholz
Case Number: 2:2020rd00017
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Walter T McGovern
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (DS)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #1 Order to Show Cause by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Mailed Order to address on docket. Reciprocal Discipline case closed.(DS)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE from The Supreme Court of Washington, Order No. 201,955-2, Order Removing Attorney from Suspension Order. Mr. Birkholz reinstated to honorary status.(DS)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Mailed Order to addresses on docket. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2020. (DS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE from the Washington State Supreme Court, Suspension Order No. 201,955-2, Administrative Suspension for Failure to Comply with 2020 Licensing Requirements.(DS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Frank William Birkholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Frank W Birkholz
Represented By: Frank William Birkholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?