Asset Realty LLC v. Wilson et al
Petitioner: Asset Realty, LLC and Asset Realty LLC
Respondent: Chad Cooley and Michelle Wilson
Case Number: 2:2021cv00081
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY, filed by Respondent Chad Cooley, TO RESPONSE to #16 MOTION Enjoin Arbitration Proceedings Against Cooley (Huffington, Jean)
March 17, 2021 Noting Date Set re #1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award Noting Date 3/12/2021, per the direction of chambers. (PM)
March 15, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE, by Petitioner Asset Realty LLC, to #16 MOTION Enjoin Arbitration Proceedings Against Cooley . (McGlothin, Dennis)
March 15, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Jessica Cox re Opposition to Cooley's Motion to Enjoin Arbitration filed by Petitioner Asset Realty LLC re #16 MOTION Enjoin Arbitration Proceedings Against Cooley (Henrie, Scott)
February 25, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION Enjoin Arbitration Proceedings Against Cooley , filed by Respondent Chad Cooley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chad Cooley in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Cooley) Noting Date 3/19/2021, (Huffington, Jean)
February 25, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jean E Huffington on behalf of Respondent Chad Cooley. (Huffington, Jean)
February 23, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Service of summons/complaint on Respondent Michelle Wilson; served 2/14/2021, by Petitioner Asset Realty LLC (Henrie, Scott) Modified on 2/24/2021 (PM).
February 4, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #11 MOTION for Order Authorizing Service By Email of Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award - proposed AMENDED Order (correcting Noting Date) Authorizing Service By Mail of Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award (Henrie, Scott)
February 4, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Scott B. Henrie in Support of Motion for Order Authorizing Service By Email of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Petitioner Asset Realty LLC re #11 MOTION for Order Authorizing Service By Email of Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award (Henrie, Scott)
February 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Order Authorizing Service By Email of Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award , filed by Petitioner Asset Realty LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Authorization to Serve By Mail) Noting Date 2/19/2021, (Henrie, Scott)
February 3, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Michelle Wilson. (PM)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant MICHELLE WILSON by Petitioner Asset Realty LLC (Henrie, Scott)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dennis J. McGlothin on behalf of Petitioner Asset Realty LLC. (McGlothin, Dennis)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDMENT to Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award re Diversity to #1 Petition (Other) by Petitioner Asset Realty LLC (Henrie, Scott)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDMENT to Civil Cover Sheet re Diversity to #1 Petition (Other), #2 Civil Cover Sheet by Petitioner Asset Realty LLC (Henrie, Scott)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jessica Marie Cox on behalf of Petitioner Asset Realty LLC. (Cox, Jessica)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
January 22, 2021 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Scott B. Henrie in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award re #1 Petition (Other) by Petitioner Asset Realty, LLC (Henrie, Scott)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Petition (Other) ; filed by Petitioner Asset Realty, LLC. (Henrie, Scott)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Receipt # AWAWDC-6890513), filed by Asset Realty, LLC. Noted by Clerk for 3/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henrie, Scott) Modified on 3/17/2021 to turn into a motion per direction of chambers (PM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asset Realty LLC v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Cooley
Represented By: Jean E Huffington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michelle Wilson
Represented By: Douglas S Tingvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Asset Realty, LLC
Represented By: Dennis J. McGlothin
Represented By: Scott B Henrie
Represented By: Jessica Marie Cox
Represented By: Robert Joseph Cadranell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Asset Realty LLC
Represented By: Dennis J. McGlothin
Represented By: Scott B Henrie
Represented By: Jessica Marie Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?