Pratt v. Alaska Airlines Inc
Plaintiff: Christopher Pratt
Defendant: Alaska Airlines Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00084
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Laura Crisp filed by Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc re #19 MOTION to Remand (Gabel, Molly)
March 22, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE, by Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc, to #19 MOTION to Remand . Oral Argument Requested. (Gabel, Molly)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Danielle Marie Kays for Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 15, 2021 Filing 22 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Danielle M. Kays FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6999596 (Gabel, Molly)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND AND CHANGING THE MOTION'S NOTING DATE TO MARCH 26, 2021 re #20 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time, by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
March 11, 2021 Filing 20 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/11/2021, (Gabel, Molly)
February 22, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Christopher Pratt. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/19/2021, (Fomina, Vera)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 4/5/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/15/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/29/2021, by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
February 22, 2021 Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 4/5/2021. (KEB)
February 5, 2021 Filing 16 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Christopher Pratt (Fomina, Vera)
February 5, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (No declinations received.) (KEB)
February 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER re #13 Notice of Appearance. Attorney Danielle M Kays is not admitted to practice in the US District Court, Western District of Washington. It will be necessary to apply for Pro Hac Vice admission in this case. Counsel will be removed from the docket following this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KMC)
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Danielle Marie Kays on behalf of Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc. (Kays, Danielle)
January 25, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 2/1/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
January 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG)
January 25, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 PRAECIPE re #5 Certificate of Service by Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc (Gabel, Molly)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc. (Gabel, Molly)
January 25, 2021 Judge David W. Christel added. (SG)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE re #1 Notice of Removal, of Filing Notice of Removal in King County Superior Court by Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc (Gabel, Molly)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Alaska Air Group Inc for Alaska Airlines Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Alaska Airlines Inc (Gabel, Molly)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, (Gabel, Molly)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc (Gabel, Molly)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Molly Gabel by Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc (Gabel, Molly)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Laura Crisp re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Alaska Airlines Inc (Gabel, Molly)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-00905-7 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6893325) Attorney Molly Gabel added to party Alaska Airlines Inc(pty:dft), filed by Alaska Airlines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gabel, Molly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pratt v. Alaska Airlines Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Airlines Inc
Represented By: Molly Gabel
Represented By: Danielle Marie Kays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Pratt
Represented By: Gregory M Skidmore
Represented By: Vera Fomina
Represented By: Damien N Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?