Progressive Casualty Insurance Company v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Progressive Casualty Ins. Co. and Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00117
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Kristof, James)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States of America (LH)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Kristof, James)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Kristof, James)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Kristof, James)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Kristof, James)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG)
February 1, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/8/2021. (SG)
February 1, 2021 Judge James L. Robart added. (SG)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) United States of America (Receipt # AWAWDC-6908933) Attorney James Michael Kristof added to party Progressive Casualty Ins. Co.(pty:pla), filed by Progressive Casualty Ins. Co..(Kristof, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Casualty Ins. Co.
Represented By: James Michael Kristof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: James Michael Kristof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?