Providence Regional Medical Center Everett et al v. Cochran
Plaintiff: MultiCare Health System, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance, Valley Medical Center, Kadlec Regional Medical Center, Providence Alaska Medical Center, Providence Newberg Medical Center, Swedish Health Services, Providence Holy Cross Medical Center, Providence St Patrick Hospital, Providence Regional Medical Center Everett, Harborview Medical Center, Providence St Vincent Medical Center, University of Washington Medical Center, Providence St Peter Hospital, Providence Portland Medical Center, Providence Tarzana Medical Center, Providence Holy Family Hospital, Providence St Joseph Medical Center, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center San Pedro, Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center, Providence Willamette Falls Medical Center, Providence St Mary Medical Center, Providence Medford Medical Center, Providence Milwaukie Hospital, MultiCare Health System doing business as Auburn Medical Center, MultiCare Health System doing business as Good Samaritan Hospital, Swedish Health Services doing business as Swedish Medical Center Cherry Hill, Swedish Health Services doing business as Swedish Edmonds Hospital, Swedish Health Services doing business as Swedish Issaquah Hospital, Swedish Health Services doing business as Swedish Medical Center and MultiCare Health System doing business as Tacoma General Allenmore Hospital
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services and Norris Cochran
Case Number: 2:2021cv00122
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/13/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/20/2021, Joint Status Report due by 5/27/2021. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: This case is hereby transferred to the Honorable Robert J. Bryan as related to C18-5731RJB and C18-1612RJB. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C21-0122RJB. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
February 26, 2021 JSR due 5/27/2021. (JL)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Norris Cochran. (RE)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 PRAECIPE to attach document (Civil Cover Sheet) re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Harborview Medical Center, Kadlec Regional Medical Center, MultiCare Health System, MultiCare Health System, MultiCare Health System, Providence Alaska Medical Center, Providence Holy Cross Medical Center, Providence Holy Family Hospital, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center San Pedro, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance, Providence Medford Medical Center, Providence Milwaukie Hospital, Providence Newberg Medical Center, Providence Portland Medical Center, Providence Regional Medical Center Everett, Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center, Providence St Joseph Medical Center, Providence St Mary Medical Center, Providence St Patrick Hospital, Providence St Peter Hospital, Providence St Vincent Medical Center, Providence Tarzana Medical Center, Providence Willamette Falls Medical Center, Swedish Health Services, Swedish Health Services, Swedish Health Services, Swedish Health Services, University of Washington Medical Center, Valley Medical Center (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Additional Plaintiffs)(Sherman, Teresa)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW UNDER MEDICARE ACT by Plaintiffs Harborview Medical Center, Kadlec Regional Medical Center, MultiCare Health System, MultiCare Health System, MultiCare Health System, Providence Alaska Medical Center, Providence Holy Cross Medical Center, Providence Holy Family Hospital, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center San Pedro, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance, Providence Medford Medical Center, Providence Milwaukie Hospital, Providence Newberg Medical Center, Providence Portland Medical Center, Providence Regional Medical Center Everett, Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center, Providence St Joseph Medical Center, Providence St Mary Medical Center, Providence St Patrick Hospital, Providence St Peter Hospital, Providence St Vincent Medical Center, Providence Tarzana Medical Center, Providence Willamette Falls Medical Center, Swedish Health Services, Swedish Health Services, Swedish Health Services, Swedish Health Services, University of Washington Medical Center, Valley Medical Center (Sherman, Teresa)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ; filed by Plaintiffs Harborview Medical Center, Kadlec Regional Medical Center, MultiCare Health System, MultiCare Health System, MultiCare Health System, Providence Alaska Medical Center, Providence Holy Cross Medical Center, Providence Holy Family Hospital, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center San Pedro, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance, Providence Medford Medical Center, Providence Milwaukie Hospital, Providence Newberg Medical Center, Providence Portland Medical Center, Providence Regional Medical Center Everett, Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center, Providence St Joseph Medical Center, Providence St Mary Medical Center, Providence St Patrick Hospital, Providence St Peter Hospital, Providence St Vincent Medical Center, Providence Tarzana Medical Center, Providence Willamette Falls Medical Center, Swedish Health Services, Swedish Health Services, Swedish Health Services, Swedish Health Services, University of Washington Medical Center, Valley Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Additional Plaintiffs)(Sherman, Teresa)
February 1, 2021 Judge James L. Robart added. (RE)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Providence Health & Services Washington for Providence Alaska Medical Center, Providence Holy Family Hospital, Providence Regional Medical Center Everett, Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center, Providence St Mary Medical Center, Providence St Peter Hospital; Corporate Parent Providence Health & Services Oregon for Providence Medford Medical Center, Providence Milwaukie Hospital, Providence Newberg Medical Center, Providence Portland Medical Center, Providence St Vincent Medical Center, Providence Willamette Falls Medical Center; Corporate Parent Providence Health System Southern California for Providence Holy Cross Medical Center, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center San Pedro, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance, Providence St Joseph Medical Center, Providence Tarzana Medical Center; Corporate Parent Western HealthConnect for Kadlec Regional Medical Center, Swedish Health Services, Swedish Health Services, Swedish Health Services, Swedish Health Services; Corporate Parent Providence Health & Services Montana for Providence St Patrick Hospital. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Harborview Medical Center, Kadlec Regional Medical Center, MultiCare Health System(MultiCare Health System dba Auburn Medical Center), MultiCare Health System(MultiCare Health System dba Good Samaritan Hospital), MultiCare Health System(MultiCare Health System dba Tacoma General Allenmore Hospital), Providence Alaska Medical Center, Providence Holy Cross Medical Center, Providence Holy Family Hospital, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center San Pedro, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance, Providence Medford Medical Center, Providence Milwaukie Hospital, Providence Newberg Medical Center, Providence Portland Medical Center, Providence Regional Medical Center Everett, Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center, Providence St Joseph Medical Center, Providence St Mary Medical Center, Providence St Patrick Hospital, Providence St Peter Hospital, Providence St Vincent Medical Center, Providence Tarzana Medical Center, Providence Willamette Falls Medical Center, Swedish Health Services(Swedish Health Services dba Swedish Issaquah Hospital), Swedish Health Services(Swedish Health Services dba Swedish Edmonds Hospital), Swedish Health Services(Swedish Health Services dba Swedish Medical Center), Swedish Health Services(Swedish Health Services dba Swedish Medical Center Cherry Hill), University of Washington Medical Center, Valley Medical Center (Sherman, Teresa)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 3:18-cv-05731; 2:18-cv-01612, by Plaintiffs Harborview Medical Center, Kadlec Regional Medical Center, MultiCare Health System, MultiCare Health System, MultiCare Health System, Providence Alaska Medical Center, Providence Holy Cross Medical Center, Providence Holy Family Hospital, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center San Pedro, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance, Providence Medford Medical Center, Providence Milwaukie Hospital, Providence Newberg Medical Center, Providence Portland Medical Center, Providence Regional Medical Center Everett, Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center, Providence St Joseph Medical Center, Providence St Mary Medical Center, Providence St Patrick Hospital, Providence St Peter Hospital, Providence St Vincent Medical Center, Providence Tarzana Medical Center, Providence Willamette Falls Medical Center, Swedish Health Services, Swedish Health Services, Swedish Health Services, Swedish Health Services, University of Washington Medical Center, Valley Medical Center. (Sherman, Teresa)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW UNDER MEDICARE ACT against defendant(s)Norris Cochran Secretary of United States Department of Health and Human Services (Receipt # AWAWDC-6910195) Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Harborview Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Kadlec Regional Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party MultiCare Health System(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party MultiCare Health System(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party MultiCare Health System(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence Alaska Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence Holy Cross Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence Holy Family Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center San Pedro(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence Medford Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence Milwaukie Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence Newberg Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence Portland Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence Regional Medical Center Everett(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence St Joseph Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence St Mary Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence St Patrick Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence St Peter Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence St Vincent Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence Tarzana Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Providence Willamette Falls Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Swedish Health Services(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Swedish Health Services(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Swedish Health Services(pty:pla), Attorney Teresa A Sherman added to party Swedish Health Services(pty:pla), filed by MultiCare Health System(MultiCare Health System dba Auburn Medical Center), Providence Holy Family Hospital, Providence Newberg Medical Center, Swedish Health Services(Swedish Health Services dba Swedish Issaquah Hospital), Providence Alaska Medical Center, Providence Portland Medical Center, Providence Willamette Falls Medical Center, Providence Regional Medical Center Everett, Providence St Mary Medical Center, Providence Medford Medical Center, Providence St Joseph Medical Center, Providence St Vincent Medical Center, MultiCare Health System(MultiCare Health System dba Good Samaritan Hospital), Swedish Health Services(Swedish Health Services dba Swedish Edmonds Hospital), Providence Milwaukie Hospital, Providence St Peter Hospital, Harborview Medical Center, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center San Pedro, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance, Providence Holy Cross Medical Center, Providence St Patrick Hospital, Swedish Health Services(Swedish Health Services dba Swedish Medical Center), Swedish Health Services(Swedish Health Services dba Swedish Medical Center Cherry Hill), Kadlec Regional Medical Center, Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center, Providence Tarzana Medical Center, MultiCare Health System(MultiCare Health System dba Tacoma General Allenmore Hospital). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agency Decision, #2 Exhibit Agency Decision, #3 Exhibit Agency Decision, #4 Exhibit Agency Decision, #5 Exhibit Agency Decision)(Sherman, Teresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Providence Regional Medical Center Everett et al v. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MultiCare Health System
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kadlec Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Alaska Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Newberg Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swedish Health Services
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Holy Cross Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence St Patrick Hospital
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Regional Medical Center Everett
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harborview Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence St Vincent Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Washington Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence St Peter Hospital
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Portland Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Tarzana Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Holy Family Hospital
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence St Joseph Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center San Pedro
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Sacred Heart Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Willamette Falls Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence St Mary Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Medford Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Providence Milwaukie Hospital
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MultiCare Health System doing business as Auburn Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MultiCare Health System doing business as Good Samaritan Hospital
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swedish Health Services doing business as Swedish Medical Center Cherry Hill
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swedish Health Services doing business as Swedish Edmonds Hospital
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swedish Health Services doing business as Swedish Issaquah Hospital
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swedish Health Services doing business as Swedish Medical Center
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MultiCare Health System doing business as Tacoma General Allenmore Hospital
Represented By: Teresa A Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norris Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?