Miller v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Miller, Philip Sullivan, Emad Al-Kahlout, Jose Grinan, Kimberly Halo, Hamady Bocoum, Juma Lawson and Kelly Kimmey
Defendant: Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00204
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard G Rosenblatt for defendants Amazon Logistics Inc and Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael J Puma for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, and Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #20 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mary Grace Patterson for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, and Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 18, 2021 Filing 22 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard G. Rosenblatt FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7004689 (Sullivan, Sheehan)
March 18, 2021 Filing 21 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael J. Puma FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7004680 (Sullivan, Sheehan)
March 18, 2021 Filing 20 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mary Grace Patterson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7004656 (Sullivan, Sheehan)
March 18, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected First Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Attorney Jennifer Rust Murray added to party Emad Al-Kahlout(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer Rust Murray added to party Hamady Bocoum(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer Rust Murray added to party Jose Grinan(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer Rust Murray added to party Kimberly Halo(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer Rust Murray added to party Kelly Kimmey(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer Rust Murray added to party Juma Lawson(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer Rust Murray added to party Philip Sullivan(pty:pla), filed by Emad Al-Kahlout, Hamady Bocoum, Jose Grinan, Jennifer Miller, Philip Sullivan, Juma Lawson, Kimberly Halo, Kelly Kimmey.(Murray, Jennifer)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Paul M Botros for Plaintiffs Emad Al-Kahlout, Hamady Bocoum, Jose Grinan, Kimberly Halo, Kelly Kimmey, Juma Lawson, Jennifer Miller, and Philip Sullivan, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew R Frisch for Plaintiffs Emad Al-Kahlout, Hamady Bocoum, Jose Grinan, Kimberly Halo, Kelly Kimmey, Juma Lawson, Jennifer Miller, and Philip Sullivan, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 18, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Paul M. Botros FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Emad Al-Kahlout, Hamady Bocoum, Jose Grinan, Kimberly Halo, Kelly Kimmey, Juma Lawson, Jennifer Miller, Philip Sullivan (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7004002 (Marshall, Toby)
March 18, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew R. Frisch FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Emad Al-Kahlout, Hamady Bocoum, Jose Grinan, Kimberly Halo, Kelly Kimmey, Juma Lawson, Jennifer Miller, Philip Sullivan (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7003989 (Marshall, Toby)
March 18, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc with JURY DEMAND Attorney Hillary Schwab added to party Emad Al-Kahlout(pty:pla), Attorney Hillary Schwab added to party Juma Lawson(pty:pla), Attorney Hillary Schwab added to party Philip Sullivan(pty:pla), Attorney Hillary Schwab added to party Jose Grinan(pty:pla), Attorney Hillary Schwab added to party Kelly Kimmey(pty:pla), Attorney Hillary Schwab added to party Kimberly Halo(pty:pla), Attorney Hillary Schwab added to party Hamady Bocoum(pty:pla), filed by Jennifer Miller, Emad Al-Kahlout, Jose Grinan, Kelly Kimmey, Juma Lawson, Hamady Bocoum, Philip Sullivan, Kimberly Halo.(Schwab, Hillary)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 6/21/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/7/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/14/2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Parties' #11 Stipulated Motion AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to May 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LH)
March 10, 2021 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, filed by Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc. (Payson, Kenneth)
March 9, 2021 Attorney Sheehan H Sullivan added for Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc; per #10 Notice of Appearance. (SR)
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kenneth E Payson on behalf of Defendants Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc. (Payson, Kenneth)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Amazon Logistics, Inc. on 2/23/2021, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Miller. (Murray, Jennifer)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Amazon.com, Inc. on 2/23/2021, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Miller. (Murray, Jennifer)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Hillary Schwab for Plaintiff Jennifer Miller, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brant Casavant for Plaintiff Jennifer Miller, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brant Casavant FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jennifer Miller (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6963676 (Marshall, Toby)
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Hillary Schwab FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jennifer Miller (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6963667 (Marshall, Toby)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (DK)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Amazon)(RE)
February 18, 2021 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (RE)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Amazon Logistics Inc, Amazon.com Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6947660) Attorney Beth E Terrell added to party Jennifer Miller(pty:pla), filed by Jennifer Miller. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Terrell, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics Inc
Represented By: Mary Grace Patterson
Represented By: Michael J Puma
Represented By: Richard G Rosenblatt
Represented By: Kenneth E Payson
Represented By: Sheehan H Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Mary Grace Patterson
Represented By: Michael J Puma
Represented By: Richard G Rosenblatt
Represented By: Kenneth E Payson
Represented By: Sheehan H Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Miller
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Andrew R Frisch
Represented By: Hillary Schwab
Represented By: Brant Casavant
Represented By: Paul M Botros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Sullivan
Represented By: Hillary Schwab
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Andrew R Frisch
Represented By: Paul M Botros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emad Al-Kahlout
Represented By: Hillary Schwab
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Andrew R Frisch
Represented By: Paul M Botros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Grinan
Represented By: Hillary Schwab
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Andrew R Frisch
Represented By: Paul M Botros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Halo
Represented By: Hillary Schwab
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Andrew R Frisch
Represented By: Paul M Botros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamady Bocoum
Represented By: Hillary Schwab
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Andrew R Frisch
Represented By: Paul M Botros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juma Lawson
Represented By: Hillary Schwab
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Andrew R Frisch
Represented By: Paul M Botros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Kimmey
Represented By: Hillary Schwab
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: Andrew R Frisch
Represented By: Paul M Botros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?