Zuchowski v. Community Loan Servicing LLC
Plaintiff: Romuald Zuchowski
Defendant: Community Loan Servicing, LLC and Community Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00269
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 6/9/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/26/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/2/2021. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
April 15, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY, filed by Defendant Community Loan Servicing LLC, TO RESPONSE to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Smith, Nathan)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER re Defendant's #6 MOTION TO DISMISS. The Court hereby re-notes Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for April 23, 2021, to be considered after the briefing on Plaintiff's #10 Motion to Remand is complete. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SR)
April 12, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Romuald Zuchowski, to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. (Zuchowski, Romuald)
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, William M McCool. (KEB)
March 30, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE, by Defendant Community Loan Servicing LLC, to #10 MOTION to Remand . (Smith, Nathan)
March 29, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTION to the NOTING DATE re #10 MOTION to Remand TO: 4/23/2021. (refer to LCR 7(d)(3) & 7(d)(6)) (GMR)
March 26, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Romuald Zuchowski. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit)(Zuchowski, Romuald)
March 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE: Plaintiff Romuald Zuchowski has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (STP)
March 9, 2021 Noting Date Reset re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to accommodate the consent deadline. Noting Date 4/16/2021. (cc: Plaintiff)(KEB)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 4/12/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (cc: Plaintiff) (KEB)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG) Modified on 3/4/2021 letter mailed to plaintiff on or about 3/4/21 (SG).
March 4, 2021 Judge David W. Christel added. (SG)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, filed by Defendant Community Loan Servicing, LLC. Noting Date 3/26/2021 4/23/2021, (Smith, Nathan) Modified on 4/13/2021 per dkt #14 (SR).
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Community Loan Servicing, LLC re #2 Verification of State Court Records, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet (Smith, Nathan)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Community Loan Servicing, LLC. (Smith, Nathan)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Other Affiliate Bayview Asset Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Bayview Financial Management Corp., Other Affiliate QKF Corporation, Other Affiliate BFTG Holding Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Bayview Asset Management Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Bayview Financial Holdings, LP for Community Loan Servicing, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Community Loan Servicing, LLC (Smith, Nathan)
March 3, 2021 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Community Loan Servicing, LLC (Smith, Nathan)
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 21-2-02428-5 KNT; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6981527) Attorney Nathan F. Smith added to party Community Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft), filed by Community Loan Servicing, LLC.(Smith, Nathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2021: #1 Complaint) (SG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuchowski v. Community Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romuald Zuchowski
Represented By: E-Filing/Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Nathan F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Nathan F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?