Grimms et al v. Carnival Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brian Grimms and Brent Reil
Defendant: Carnival PLC, Carnival Corporation and Holland America Line NV doing business as Holland America Line NV LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00311
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Gabriel_Traber@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 8/24/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Hannah Lazarz for Plaintiffs Brian Grimms, and Brent Reil, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 21, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Carnival PLC mailed on 4/1/2021 (Dennett, Jason)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christopher E Coleman for plaintiffs Brian Grimms and Brent Reil, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kenneth S Byrd for plaintiffs Brian Grimms and Brent Reil, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mark P Chalos for plaintiffs Brian Grimms and Brent Reil, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Holland America Line NV mailed on 4/1/2021 (Dennett, Jason)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher E. Coleman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Brian Grimms, Brent Reil (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7050778 (Dennett, Jason)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Hannah R. Lazarz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Brian Grimms, Brent Reil (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7050774 (Dennett, Jason)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kenneth S. Byrd FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Brian Grimms, Brent Reil (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7050763 (Dennett, Jason)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mark P. Chalos FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Brian Grimms, Brent Reil (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7050751 (Dennett, Jason)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(CDA)
March 9, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (CDA)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-00982-TSZ, by Plaintiffs Brian Grimms, Brent Reil. (Dennett, Jason)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Carnival Corporation, Carnival PLC, Holland America Line NV with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6990893), filed by Brian Grimms, Brent Reil. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Dennett, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimms et al v. Carnival Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland America Line NV doing business as Holland America Line NV LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Grimms
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Hannah Lazarz
Represented By: Kenneth S Byrd
Represented By: Christopher E Coleman
Represented By: Mark P Chalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Reil
Represented By: Rebecca Luise Solomon
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Jason T Dennett
Represented By: Hannah Lazarz
Represented By: Kenneth S Byrd
Represented By: Christopher E Coleman
Represented By: Mark P Chalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?