Garcia v. United States of America
Petitioner: Baltazar Reyes Garcia
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00322
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE Documents served electronically to United States of America on 3/23/2021. Within forty-five (45) days after such service, the United States shall file and serve an Answer. On the face of the Answer, the United States shall note the Answer for consideration on the fourth Friday after it is filed. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: Petitioner via US mail)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: petitioner via USPS) (ST)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 2255 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence, filed by Baltazar Reyes Garcia. Related to criminal case: 16-cr-287-JLR-3.(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Kate S Vaughan
Represented By: Steven Masada
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Helen J Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Baltazar Reyes Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?