Guerrero et al v. Charles Schwab & Co Inc et al
Plaintiff: Peter Leon Guerrero, Emilie Dawson, Robert LaCanfora, Christine Eason, Martha Wyatt, Natasha Ehrlich, Nadine Dawson, Ian Hilton, Benjamin Capdevielle, Stephen Naramore, Brandon Ehrlich, Irene Guerrero, Carrie Miller, David Miller, Carol Hilton, Joann LaCanfora, Gary Wyatt, Patricia Hamilton, Holly Robinson, Tony Eason, Diana Naramore, Shannon A McQuery, Stephen W Apt, Eugene T Rogers, Pamela N Apt and Bryce J Dawson
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co Inc and Interactive Brokers LLC
Respondent: Interactive Brokers, LLC and Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Claimant: Shannon A. McQuery, Bryce J. Dawson, Stephen W. Apt, Eugene T. Rogers and Pamela N. Apt
Case Number: 2:2021cv00446
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated per Plaintiff's #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of All Claims Against Defendants/Respondents. (PM)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiffs Pamela N Apt, Stephen W Apt, Benjamin Capdevielle, Bryce J Dawson, Nadine Dawson, Emilie Dawson, Christine Eason, Tony Eason, Natasha Ehrlich, Brandon Ehrlich, Peter Leon Guerrero, Irene Guerrero, Patricia Hamilton, Ian Hilton, Carol Hilton, Robert LaCanfora, Joann LaCanfora, Shannon A McQuery, Carrie Miller, David Miller, Diana Naramore, Stephen Naramore, Holly Robinson, Eugene T Rogers, Martha Wyatt, Gary Wyatt (Fitzgerald, Timothy)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. on 4/7/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Pamela N Apt, Stephen W Apt, Benjamin Capdevielle, Bryce J Dawson, Nadine Dawson, Emilie Dawson, Christine Eason, Tony Eason, Natasha Ehrlich, Brandon Ehrlich, Peter Leon Guerrero, Irene Guerrero, Patricia Hamilton, Ian Hilton, Carol Hilton, Robert LaCanfora, Joann LaCanfora, Shannon A McQuery, Carrie Miller, David Miller, Diana Naramore, Stephen Naramore, Holly Robinson, Eugene T Rogers, Martha Wyatt, Gary Wyatt. (Hollon, Gregory)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued to defendant(s) Charles Schwab & Co Inc and Interactive Brokers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(RE)
April 6, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (RE)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Interactive Brokers, LLC by Claimants Pamela N. Apt, Stephen W. Apt, Benjamin Capdevielle, Bryce J. Dawson, Nadine Dawson, Emilie Dawson, Christine Eason, Tony Eason, Natasha Ehrlich, Brandon Ehrlich, Peter Leon Guerrero, Irene Guerrero, Patricia Hamilton, Ian Hilton, Carol Hilton, Robert LaCanfora, Joann LaCanfora, Shannon A. McQuery, Carrie Miller, David Miller, Diana Naramore, Stephen Naramore, Holly Robinson, Eugene T. Rogers, Martha Wyatt, Gary Wyatt (Hollon, Gregory)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Charles Schwab & Co. by Claimants Pamela N. Apt, Stephen W. Apt, Benjamin Capdevielle, Bryce J. Dawson, Nadine Dawson, Emilie Dawson, Christine Eason, Tony Eason, Natasha Ehrlich, Brandon Ehrlich, Peter Leon Guerrero, Irene Guerrero, Patricia Hamilton, Ian Hilton, Carol Hilton, Robert LaCanfora, Joann LaCanfora, Shannon A. McQuery, Carrie Miller, David Miller, Diana Naramore, Stephen Naramore, Holly Robinson, Eugene T. Rogers, Martha Wyatt, Gary Wyatt (Hollon, Gregory)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Receipt # AWAWDC-7026129), filed by Tony Eason, Diana Naramore, Gary Wyatt, Pamela N. Apt, Peter Leon Guerrero, Nadine Dawson, Eugene T. Rogers, Irene Guerrero, Holly Robinson, David Miller, Shannon A. McQuery, Bryce J. Dawson, Stephen W. Apt, Natasha Ehrlich, Joann LaCanfora, Carol Hilton, Christine Eason, Stephen Naramore, Carrie Miller, Emilie Dawson, Martha Wyatt, Robert LaCanfora, Patricia Hamilton, Benjamin Capdevielle, Ian Hilton, Brandon Ehrlich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hollon, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerrero et al v. Charles Schwab & Co Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Leon Guerrero
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilie Dawson
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert LaCanfora
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Eason
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Wyatt
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Ehrlich
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadine Dawson
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Hilton
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Capdevielle
Represented By: John A Bender, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Naramore
Represented By: John A Bender, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Ehrlich
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Guerrero
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Miller
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Miller
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Hilton
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann LaCanfora
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Wyatt
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hamilton
Represented By: John A Bender, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Robinson
Represented By: John A Bender, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Eason
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Naramore
Represented By: John A Bender, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon A McQuery
Represented By: John A Bender, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen W Apt
Represented By: John A Bender, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene T Rogers
Represented By: John A Bender, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela N Apt
Represented By: John A Bender, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce J Dawson
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Shannon A. McQuery
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bryce J. Dawson
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stephen W. Apt
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eugene T. Rogers
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Pamela N. Apt
Represented By: Gregory J Hollon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Interactive Brokers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interactive Brokers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?