Silva v. Sanders
Plaintiff: Ramon Saul Silva, Jr
Defendant: Benjamin Sanders
Case Number: 2:2021cv00472
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Amanda S Froh on behalf of Defendant Benjamin Sanders. **PRINT ALL**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609)(Froh, Amanda)
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Benjamin Sanders mailed on 5/14/2021. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609)(SP)
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF OPTION TO CONSENT TO US MAGISTRATE JUDGE. To consent to a US Magistrate Judge, return the executed form by 6/14/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609)(SP)
May 14, 2021 Check status of service waiver per #8 Order Directing Service due by 6/21/2021. **DO NOT PRINT**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609)(SP)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by First-Class Mail to Benjamin Sanders; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. ( #7 Amended Complaint, this Order, notice of lawsuit and waiver of service, and notice of option to consent mailed on 5/14/21) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609)(SP-cc: King County Prosecuting Attorney's Office w/Order and copy of Amended Complaint) Modified on 5/14/2021 to add cc info (SP)
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Benjamin Sanders with JURY DEMAND, filed by Ramon Saul Silva, Jr. **12 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609)(SP)
April 26, 2021 Response to #6 Order to File Amended Complaint due by 5/26/2021. **DO NOT PRINT**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609)(SP)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. If Plaintiff intends to pursue a 1983 civil rights action in this Court, he must file an amended complaint on or before May 26, 2021. (Attachments: #1 1983 Civil Rights Complaint Form (blank), #2 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**15 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609)(SP)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Benjamin Sanders with JURY DEMAND, filed by Ramon Saul Silva, Jr. (IFP Granted) **9 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609)(SP)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS; signed by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609)(SP)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609)(SP)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Ramon Saul Silva, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)**13 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ramon Silva, Prisoner ID: 326609)(SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva v. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Saul Silva, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Sanders
Represented By: Amanda S Froh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?