Fremont Stash LLC v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Fremont Stash, LLC and Fremont Stash LLC
Defendant: Karl K Keich and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00482
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated per #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Interpleader Complaint Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), without prejudice. (PM)
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Fremont Stash LLC (Colvin, John)
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 PRAECIPE to attach document (Amended Signature Pages) re #6 Notice of Appearance by Plaintiff Fremont Stash LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harn, Jason)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 PRAECIPE to attach document (Amended Signature Page) re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Fremont Stash LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Colvin, John)
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 Praecipe to Attach Document. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SR)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 PRAECIPE to attach document (Corrected Signature Page) re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Fremont Stash LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Colvin, John)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jason A Harn on behalf of Plaintiff Fremont Stash LLC. (Harn, Jason)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fremont Stash LLC (Colvin, John)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (DK)
April 12, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s), Improper Signature.See attached letter for more information and instructions.Corrected signature page must be filed by 4/26/2021. (SG)
April 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SG)
April 12, 2021 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SG)
April 12, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/19/2021. (SG)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against defendant(s) Fremont Stash, LLC (Receipt # AWAWDC-7035702) Attorney John Mark Colvin added to party Fremont Stash, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Fremont Stash, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E., #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Colvin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fremont Stash LLC v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl K Keich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fremont Stash, LLC
Represented By: Jason A Harn
Represented By: John Mark Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fremont Stash LLC
Represented By: Jason A Harn
Represented By: John Mark Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?