State of Washington v. United States National Archives and Records Administration
Plaintiff: Washington State and State of Washington
Defendant: United States National Archives and Records Administration
Defendant / Appellee: National Archives and Records Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00565
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States National Archives and Records Administration.(Fairchild, Katie)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katie Denise Fairchild on behalf of Defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration. (Fairchild, Katie)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff State of Washington re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Related Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fraas, Lauryn)
April 30, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. (GT)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration (CDA)
April 28, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (CDA)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-1231-RSL; 2:20-cv-1232-RSL; 2:20-cv-1233-RSL; 2:20-cv-1364-RSL, by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Fraas, Lauryn)
April 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) National Archives and Records Administration (Receipt # AWAWDC-7060150), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fraas, Lauryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington v. United States National Archives and Records Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington State
Represented By: Nathan Bays
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Nathan Bays
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: National Archives and Records Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States National Archives and Records Administration
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?