Gutierrez et al v. E&E Foods et al
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Lopez, Jose Gutierrez, Trinidad Mariscal, Joel Sandoval, Arturo Gonzalez, Xavier Ortiz and Gerber Giron Barrios
Defendant: F/V Beagle, LLC, E&E Foods and F/V Beagle LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00682
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1916
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER re #19 Joint Status Report. The following MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez, Chief United States District Judge: On July 20, 2021, the parties filed a joint status report indicating that a case schedule should not be set until after the Court rules on Plaintiffs' pending motion for preliminary collective action certification. Dkt. #19 at 5. "[T]he parties propose that they [will] submit a proposed trial schedule and date... within 10 days of the Court's order on Plaintiffs' pending motion." Id. The Court approves the request and will issue a scheduling order after receipt of the parties' proposal. (CAO)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 6. Filed by Plaintiffs Gerber Giron Barrios, Arturo Gonzalez, Jose Gutierrez, Juan Carlos Lopez, Trinidad Mariscal, Xavier Ortiz, Joel Sandoval.(Johnson, Daniel)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Gerber Giron Barrios, Arturo Gonzalez, Jose Gutierrez, Juan Carlos Lopez, Trinidad Mariscal, Xavier Ortiz, Joel Sandoval (Johnson, Daniel)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gerber Giron Barrios, Arturo Gonzalez, Trinidad Mariscal, Joel Sandoval, Xavier Ortiz, Jose Gutierrez, Juan Carlos Lopez. (Attachments: #1 praecipe not to arrest vessel, #2 Consent of Counsel to File Amended)(Merriam, John)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of John Merriam filed by Plaintiffs Gerber Giron Barrios, Arturo Gonzalez, Jose Gutierrez, Juan Carlos Lopez, Trinidad Mariscal, Xavier Ortiz, Joel Sandoval re #12 MOTION Preliminary Collective Action Certification (Merriam, John)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #12 MOTION Preliminary Collective Action Certification (Johnson, Daniel)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of Patrick M. Pleas filed by Plaintiffs Gerber Giron Barrios, Arturo Gonzalez, Jose Gutierrez, Juan Carlos Lopez, Trinidad Mariscal, Xavier Ortiz, Joel Sandoval re #12 MOTION Preliminary Collective Action Certification (Johnson, Daniel)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Daniel F. Johnson filed by Plaintiffs Gerber Giron Barrios, Arturo Gonzalez, Jose Gutierrez, Juan Carlos Lopez, Trinidad Mariscal, Xavier Ortiz, Joel Sandoval re #12 MOTION Preliminary Collective Action Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Johnson, Daniel)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION Preliminary Collective Action Certification , filed by Plaintiffs Gerber Giron Barrios, Arturo Gonzalez, Jose Gutierrez, Juan Carlos Lopez, Trinidad Mariscal, Xavier Ortiz, Joel Sandoval. Noting Date 8/6/2021, (Johnson, Daniel)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting the parties' #10 Stipulated Motion to approve adding two additional named plaintiffs. It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, Xavier Ortiz and Gerber Giron Barrios may be added as additional Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(PM)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION to Add Plaintiffs, filed by Plaintiffs Arturo Gonzalez, Jose Gutierrez, Juan Carlos Lopez, Trinidad Mariscal, Joel Sandoval. Noting Date 7/9/2021, (Johnson, Daniel)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel Foster Johnson on behalf of Plaintiffs Arturo Gonzalez, Jose Gutierrez, Juan Carlos Lopez, Trinidad Mariscal, Joel Sandoval. (Johnson, Daniel)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael A Barcott on behalf of Defendants E&E Foods, F/V Beagle LLC. (Barcott, Michael)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 7/20/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/6/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/13/2021. (LC)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura, pursuant to the filing of a Notice of Related Case. The Honorable J Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (KAM)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-00273, 2:20-cv-01767, by Plaintiffs Arturo Gonzalez, Jose Gutierrez, Juan Carlos Lopez, Trinidad Mariscal, Joel Sandoval. (Merriam, John)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 6/1/2021. (MET)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDMENT Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Jose Gutierrez (Attachments: #1 Praecipe to Add Dcoument)(Merriam, John)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) E&E Foods, F/V Beagle LLC (CDA)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge J Richard Creatura added. (CDA)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs, filed by Jose Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Merriam, John) (Prepayment Waived) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/27/2021) (KAM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez et al v. E&E Foods et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Lopez
Represented By: John W Merriam
Represented By: Daniel Foster Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gutierrez
Represented By: John W Merriam
Represented By: Daniel Foster Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinidad Mariscal
Represented By: John W Merriam
Represented By: Daniel Foster Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Sandoval
Represented By: John W Merriam
Represented By: Daniel Foster Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Gonzalez
Represented By: John W Merriam
Represented By: Daniel Foster Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Ortiz
Represented By: John W Merriam
Represented By: Daniel Foster Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerber Giron Barrios
Represented By: John W Merriam
Represented By: Daniel Foster Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Beagle, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E&E Foods
Represented By: Michael A Barcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Beagle LLC
Represented By: Michael A Barcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?