De Coster et al v. Amazon.com Inc
Plaintiff: Osahon Ojeaga, Elizabeth De Coster, John Mariane, Nemanja Krstic, Emma Zaballos, Maya Gold, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor and Kenneth David West
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Interested Party: Angela Hogan and Andrea Seberson
Case Number: 2:2021cv00693
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's #35 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Amazon's Motion to Dismiss, Dkt. #35 is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiffs' First Cause of Action. Plaintiffs' First Cause of Action, for Violation of the Sherman Act 15 U.S.C. 1 Per Se, is DISMISSED. Although leave to amend would typically be granted, it is not granted here as Plaintiffs would have to significantly re-work the pleadings in order to bring this claim. Plaintiffs may move for leave to amend if they so choose. The Motion is DENIED as to all other claims. The parties are to promptly propose a class certification briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re #57 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jessica B Beringer for Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West, and Emma Zaballos by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jessica B. Beringer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West, Emma Zaballos, Interested Parties Angela Hogan, Andrea Seberson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7842240 (Berman, Steve)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Goldmark on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Goldmark, John)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in Superior Court of the State of California County of San Francisco ; filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West, Emma Zaballos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berman, Steve)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SURREPLY filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint and re #52 Notice of Supplemental Authority and #53 Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority (Rummage, Stephen)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West, Emma Zaballos re #52 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Berman, Steve)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint by Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Rummage, Stephen)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #39 Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West, Emma Zaballos (Berman, Steve)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Albert Young Pak. Filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West, Emma Zaballos. (Pak, Albert)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Zina Bash. Filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West. (Bash, Zina)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Warren D Postman. Filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West, Emma Zaballos. (Postman, Warren)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #39 Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West, Emma Zaballos (Berman, Steve)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE by Defendant Amazon.com Inc re #45 Notice of Pendency of Other Action, (Rummage, Stephen)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in King County Superior Court, case number(s) in other court 22-2-01281-1 SEA ; filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West, Emma Zaballos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Berman, Steve)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #39 Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West, Emma Zaballos (Berman, Steve)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #22 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Court will not enter an order consolidating these cases for discovery purposes (as suggested by Plaintiffs' counsel in C21-996) absent further agreement from the parties. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY, filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc, TO RESPONSE to #35 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint (Rummage, Stephen)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Parties' #40 Stipulated MOTION to Defer the Deadline To File a Class Certification Motion. The Court hereby vacates the 11/22/2021 deadline for Plaintiffs to file their motion for class certification. The parties shall propose a class certification briefing schedule promptly following disposition of Amazon's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' consolidated amended complaint, should the Court deny that motion. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Stipulated MOTION to Defer the Deadline To File a Class Certification Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West, Emma Zaballos. (Berman, Steve)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West, Emma Zaballos, to #35 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint. (Berman, Steve)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re Parties' #37 Stipulated MOTION Extending Time for Reply Brief on Motion to Dismiss. Amazon may file its reply brief in support of its #35 motion to dismiss on Tuesday, 1/18/2022, noting the motion for consideration on Friday, 1/21/2022. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Reply Brief on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc. Noting Date 11/18/2021, (Rummage, Stephen)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DECLARATION of Stephen M. Rummage filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint (Rummage, Stephen)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 1/7/2022 1/21/2022 (Rummage, Stephen) Modified on 11/18/2021 (SB).
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #29 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kyle Smith for Defendant Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #28 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Amy J Mauser for Defendant Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #27 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney William A Isaacson for Defendant Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #26 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Martha L Goodman for Defendant Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #25 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Karen L Dunn for Defendant Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kyle Smith FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7235246 (Rummage, Stephen)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Amy J. Mauser FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7235238 (Rummage, Stephen)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY William A. Isaacson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7235226 (Rummage, Stephen)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Martha L. Goodman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7235219 (Rummage, Stephen)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Karen L. Dunn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7235209 (Rummage, Stephen)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West, Emma Zaballos, TO RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Berman, Steve)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Response to Motion to Consolidate re #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; filed by Interested Parties Angela Hogan, Andrea Seberson. (McEntee, Adrienne)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Noting Date Set re Plaintiffs' #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases: Noting Date 8/20/2021. (PM)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West, Emma Zaballos. Noted for 8/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) Modified on 8/6/2021 to add noting date (PM).
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 21-cv-996, 21-cv-1009, by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Maya Gold, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Megan Smith, Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West, Emma Zaballos. (Berman, Steve)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Amended Complaint against defendant(s) Amazon.com Inc with JURY DEMAND Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Elizabeth De Coster(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party John Mariane(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Osahon Ojeaga(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Emma Zaballos(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Maya Gold(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Megan Smith(pty:pla), filed by Osahon Ojeaga, Elizabeth De Coster, Kenneth David West, John Mariane, Robert Taylor, Emma Zaballos, Maya Gold, Megan Smith.(Berman, Steve)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #18 Unopposed Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Plaintiffs' Executive Committee for the Proposed Class. The Court concludes Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP and Keller Lenkner LLC are appointed, as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel, and that Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Keller Rohrback L.L.P. are appointed, as members of a Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(PM)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorney Zina Bash added as counsel for Consolidated Plaintiffs Robert Taylor and Kenneth David West, per Order granting Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed in 21-cv-694-RSM (dkts. 13, 3). (PM)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Appoint (Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Plaintiffs' Executive Committee), filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Nemanja Krstic, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Emma Zaballos, Consol Plaintiffs Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Berman Declaration, #2 Exhibit Bash Declaration, #3 Exhibit Loeser Declaration, #4 Exhibit Olson Declaration, #5 Exhibit A - Hagens Berman Firm Resume, #6 Exhibit B - Hagens Berman Antitrust Case List, #7 Exhibit C - Intuit Transcript of Proceedings, #8 Exhibit D - Resolution on Diversity in Trial Court Appointments, #9 Exhibit E - Standards & Best Practices for Large & Mass-Tort MDLs, #10 Exhibit F - Keller Lenkner Firm Profile, #11 Exhibit G - Keller Rohrback Firm Resume, #12 Exhibit H - American Lawyer article, #13 Exhibit I - Wall St. Journal Article, #14 Exhibit J - Law360 Article, #15 Exhibit K - Law360 Article, #16 Exhibit L - Benchmark Litigation List, #17 Exhibit M - Law360 Article, #18 Exhibit N - Legal500 List, #19 Exhibit O - Chambers Research Entry, #20 Exhibit P - Law360 Article, #21 Exhibit Q - Lawdragon List, #22 Exhibit R - Legal500 List, #23 Exhibit S - Steig Olson Attorney Profile, #24 Exhibit T - Adam Wolfson Attorney Profile, #25 Exhibit U - Alicia Cobb Attorney Profile) Noting Date 7/16/2021, (Berman, Steve)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MaryAnn T Almeida on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Almeida, MaryAnn)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephen M Rummage on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Rummage, Stephen)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting the parties' #14 Stipulated MOTION for Consolidation, Filing of Consolidated Amended Complaint, and Schedule for Answer or Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated amended class action complaint within 30 days of entry of this order. Amazon shall file an answer or otherwise respond within 60 days after Plaintiffs file their consolidated amended class action complaint. If Amazon moves to dismiss and Plaintiffs do not amend a second time, Plaintiffs' opposition to any motion to dismiss shall be due 60 days after the deadline for Amazons motion to dismiss. Amazon shall have 45 days to file its reply brief. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Consolidation, Filing of Consolidated Amended Complaint, and Schedule for Answer or Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Nemanja Krstic, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Emma Zaballos. Noting Date 6/18/2021, (Cobb, Alicia)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Amazon.com, Inc. on 5/28/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Nemanja Krstic, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Emma Zaballos. (Cobb, Alicia)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Amazon.com Inc. (RE)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nicolas Vernon Siebert for Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Nemanja Krstic, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, and Emma Zaballos, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David Du LeRay for Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Nemanja Krstic, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, and Emma Zaballos, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steig David Olson for Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Nemanja Krstic John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, and Emma Zaballos, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Adam Wolfson for Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Nemanja Krstic, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, and Emma Zaballos, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David LeRay FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Nemanja Krstic, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Emma Zaballos (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7100805 (Cobb, Alicia)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nicolas Siebert FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Nemanja Krstic, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Emma Zaballos (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7100804 (Cobb, Alicia)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steig Olson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Nemanja Krstic, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Emma Zaballos (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7100803 (Cobb, Alicia)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Adam Wolfson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Nemanja Krstic, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Emma Zaballos (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7100801 (Cobb, Alicia)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in D.C. Superior Court ; filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Nemanja Krstic, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Emma Zaballos. (Cobb, Alicia)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 20-cv-00424, by Plaintiffs Elizabeth De Coster, Nemanja Krstic, John Mariane, Osahon Ojeaga, Emma Zaballos. (Cobb, Alicia)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7100755) Attorney Alicia Cobb added to party Elizabeth De Coster(pty:pla), Attorney Alicia Cobb added to party Nemanja Krstic(pty:pla), Attorney Alicia Cobb added to party John Mariane(pty:pla), Attorney Alicia Cobb added to party Osahon Ojeaga(pty:pla), Attorney Alicia Cobb added to party Emma Zaballos(pty:pla), filed by Osahon Ojeaga, Elizabeth De Coster, John Mariane, Nemanja Krstic, Emma Zaballos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cobb, Alicia) Modified on 5/27/2021 to edit document title. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Coster et al v. Amazon.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osahon Ojeaga
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Represented By: Adam Wolfson
Represented By: David Du LeRay
Represented By: Nicolas Vernon Siebert
Represented By: Steig David Olson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Nicolas Siebert
Represented By: Jessica B Beringer
Represented By: Steig Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth De Coster
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Represented By: Adam Wolfson
Represented By: David Du LeRay
Represented By: Nicolas Vernon Siebert
Represented By: Steig David Olson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jessica B Beringer
Represented By: Steig Olson
Represented By: Nicolas Siebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mariane
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Represented By: Adam Wolfson
Represented By: David Du LeRay
Represented By: Nicolas Vernon Siebert
Represented By: Steig David Olson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jessica B Beringer
Represented By: Nicolas Siebert
Represented By: Steig Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nemanja Krstic
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Represented By: Adam Wolfson
Represented By: David Du LeRay
Represented By: Nicolas Vernon Siebert
Represented By: Steig David Olson
Represented By: Nicolas Siebert
Represented By: Steig Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Zaballos
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Represented By: Adam Wolfson
Represented By: David Du LeRay
Represented By: Nicolas Vernon Siebert
Represented By: Steig David Olson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jessica B Beringer
Represented By: Nicolas Siebert
Represented By: Steig Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maya Gold
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jessica B Beringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Smith
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Jessica B Beringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Taylor
Represented By: Albert Young Pak
Represented By: Barbara Mahoney
Represented By: Derek W Loeser
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Zina Bash
Represented By: Jessica B Beringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth David West
Represented By: Albert Young Pak
Represented By: Barbara Mahoney
Represented By: Derek W Loeser
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Warren D Postman
Represented By: Zina Bash
Represented By: Jessica B Beringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: MaryAnn T Almeida
Represented By: Stephen M Rummage
Represented By: Karen L Dunn
Represented By: Kyle Smith
Represented By: Martha L Goodman
Represented By: Amy J Mauser
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: John Goldmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Angela Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Andrea Seberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?