T-Mobile USA Inc v. Verity Wireless Inc
Petitioner: T-Mobile USA, Inc. and T-Mobile USA Inc
Respondent: Verity Wireless, Inc. and Verity Wireless Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00733
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 24 JUDGMENT BY COURT: The Amended Petition of T-Mobile USA Inc. (Dkt. #13 ) is GRANTED; the temporary injunction granted by The Hon. Faith Ireland (Ret.) on May 13, 2021, in the matter styled T-Mobile USA, Inc. v. Verity Wireless, Inc., JAMS Arbitration Reference No. 1160024282 is CONFIRMED. (LH)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING #22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Amended Petition of T-Mobile USA Inc. (Dkt. #13 ) is GRANTED; the temporary injunction granted by The Hon. Faith Ireland (Ret.) on May 13, 2021, in the matter styled T-Mobile USA, Inc. v. Verity Wireless, Inc., JAMS Arbitration Reference No. 1160024282 is CONFIRMED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (LH)
July 22, 2021 Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends that T-Mobile's amended petition (Dkt. #13 ) be GRANTED and that the District Court confirm the Injunction. Objections may be filed and served upon all parties no later than August 6, 2021. The Clerk should note the matter for August 9, 2021, as ready for the District Judge's consideration if no objection is filed. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MW)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Russell Scarritt Jones, Jr for Petitioner T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES: This proceeding is exempt from the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f), because it is an action to confirm an arbitration award. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B)(ix). The Court STRIKES Deadlines in #15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. (AQ)
July 9, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY by Petitioner T-Mobile USA Inc to #13 Amended Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (Andrade, Jessica)
July 6, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE by Respondent Verity Wireless Inc re #13 Amended Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baehr, Alexander)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Amy D Fitts for Petitioner T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Timothy B Yoo for Defendant Verity Wireless Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sharon Ben-Shahar Mayer for Respondent Defendant Verity Wireless Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/19/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/2/2021, Joint Status Report due by 8/16/2021. (AQ)
June 21, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Brian A Tsuchida pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (AQ)
June 18, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award, filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Andrade, Jessica)
June 17, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Russell S. Jones, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7130063 (Andrade, Jessica)
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Amy D. Fitts FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7130054 (Andrade, Jessica)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sharon Ben-Shahar Mayer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Respondent Verity Wireless Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7126921 (Baehr, Alexander)
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Timothy B. Yoo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Respondent Verity Wireless Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7126813 (Baehr, Alexander)
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Timothy B. Yoo re #7 Objections by Respondent Verity Wireless Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Taylor, Jesse)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS re #1 Petition (Other) of T-Mobile to Confirm Arbitration Award by Respondent Verity Wireless Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Petition to Confirm Arbitration)(Taylor, Jesse)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 6/21/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Andrade, Jessica)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alexander A Baehr on behalf of Respondent Verity Wireless Inc. (Baehr, Alexander)
June 7, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/14/2021. (SG)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Petitioner T-Mobile USA Inc. (Andrade, Jessica) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/4/2021 to flatten malformed PDF) (JF).
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Petition (Other). ***Action Required*** Civil Cover Sheet Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG)
June 4, 2021 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (SG)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Receipt # AWAWDC-7110685), filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Andrade, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T-Mobile USA Inc v. Verity Wireless Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica M Andrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: T-Mobile USA Inc
Represented By: Amy D Fitts
Represented By: Jessica M Andrade
Represented By: Russell Scarritt Jones, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Verity Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy B Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Verity Wireless Inc
Represented By: Sharon Ben-Shahar Mayer
Represented By: Timothy B Yoo
Represented By: Alexander A Baehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?