Ramirez v. Asher et al
Petitioner: Miguel Angel Ramirez
Respondent: Merrick B Garland, Matthew Allen, Alejandro Mayorkas, Natalie Asher, Jean King, Nathalie Asher and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00735
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Referring Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL by parties (Thorward, Minda)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss and Return, filed by Respondents Matthew Allen, Nathalie Asher, Merrick B Garland, Jean King, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) Noting Date 7/30/2021, (Kelley, Richard)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Richard Kelley on behalf of Respondents Matthew Allen, Nathalie Asher, Merrick B Garland, Jean King, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States of America. (Kelley, Richard)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR RETURN AND STATUS REPORT by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. Electronic posting of this Order, petitioner's #1 2241 Petition and all supporting documents shall effect service upon the United States Attorney and respondent(s). Within 30 days of the date this Order is posted, respondent(s) shall file a return and status report and note it for consideration on the fourth Friday after it is filed. Petitioner may file a response not later than the Monday immediately preceding the Friday appointed for consideration. Respondent(s) may file a reply brief not later than the Friday designated for consideration of the matter. (ST)
June 4, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle and Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (SG) Modified on 6/4/2021 -document regenerated to AUSA(SG).
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # AWAWDC-7111357), filed by Miguel Angel Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Thorward, Minda) Modified on 6/4/2021-add language (SG). Modified on 6/4/2021 -documents regenerated to AUSA(SG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Asher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Merrick B Garland
Represented By: Richard Kelley
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Allen
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Richard Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Richard Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Natalie Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jean King
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Richard Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nathalie Asher
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Richard Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Richard Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miguel Angel Ramirez
Represented By: Minda Thorward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?