Kessler v. Dirk M Mayberry Inc et al
Plaintiff: Robert Kessler
Defendant: Dirk M Mayberry Inc and Keyar H Kimo
Case Number: 2:2021cv00755
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12112
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Keyar H Kimo. (SR)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 Submission re #1 Complaint; filed by Defendant Keyar H Kimo. (LH)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, William M McCool. (KEB)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Dirk M Mayberry Inc, Keyar H Kimo (Attachments: #1 Summons)(CDA)
June 9, 2021 Judge David W. Christel added. (CDA)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiff Robert Kessler. (Butz, Derek)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7116590) Attorney Derek C Butz added to party Robert Kessler(pty:pla), filed by Robert Kessler. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Butz, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kessler v. Dirk M Mayberry Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirk M Mayberry Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keyar H Kimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kessler
Represented By: Derek C Butz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?