Kessler v. Huckleberry Properties LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert Kessler
Defendant: Huckleberry Properties LLC and Jeffrey Hicks
Case Number: 2:2021cv00783
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12112
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jeffrey Hicks.(Haas, Philip)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Philip Arl Haas for Defendant Jeffrey Hicks from 7/22/21 - 8/13/21. (Haas, Philip)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Philip Arl Haas on behalf of Defendant Jeffrey Hicks. (Haas, Philip)
June 14, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. (GT)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SG)
June 11, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (SG)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiff Robert Kessler. (Butz, Derek)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7120716) Attorney Derek C Butz added to party Robert Kessler(pty:pla), filed by Robert Kessler. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Butz, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kessler v. Huckleberry Properties LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huckleberry Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Hicks
Represented By: Philip Arl Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kessler
Represented By: Derek C Butz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?