Dawson v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Plaintiff: Michael E Dawson
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00784
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated per #6 Stipulated Order Quieting Title. (AD)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER QUIETING TITLE re Parties' #5 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order, filed by Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. Noting Date 7/27/2021, (Coughlin, Laura)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 8/17/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/27/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/10/2021. (AD)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Laura Nichole Coughlin on behalf of Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Coughlin, Laura)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc (SG)
June 11, 2021 Judge James L. Robart added. (SG)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc (Receipt # AWAWDC-7120801), filed by Michael E Dawson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Schneider, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: Laura Nichole Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Dawson
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?