Brooks v. Uttecht
Petitioner: Carl Alonzo Brooks
Respondent: Jeffrey Uttecht
Case Number: 2:2021cv00793
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Carl Alonzo Brooks. (Receipt # SEA104895) (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Petition, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibits 1-7)**1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)(ST)
July 20, 2021 IFP deficiency corrected **DO NOT PRINT**(Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)(ST)
July 20, 2021 FILING FEE RECEIVED: $ 5.00, Receipt#: SEA104895 **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)(ST)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER re #7 IFP Deficiency Letter, filed by Carl Alonzo Brooks. Petitioner submitted a request to CRCC on 7/14/21 authorizing payment of the filing fee. (Once the filing fee has been received, petitioner will receive confirmation that the deficiency has been corrected.)**3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)(ST)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required***See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 8/13/2021 to correct IFP application (Attachments: #1 IFP form) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)(ST)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Carl Alonzo Brooks. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Brief of Support of Petition, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibits 1-7, #5 Prison Trust Account Statement)**DO NOT PRINT**(Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)(ST) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2021: #6 Letter re IFP Certification) (ST).
July 13, 2021 IFP deficiency corrected in part. **DO NOT PRINT**(Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)(ST)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Incorrect IFP Form.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 8/9/2021 to correct IFP application. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)(ST)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Carl Alonzo Brooks. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Brief in Support of Petition, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibits 1-7, #5 Prison Trust Account Statement, #6 Cover Sheet)**79 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)(ST)
July 8, 2021 IFP deficiency corrected in part. Incorrect IFP form submitted. **DO NOT PRINT**(Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)(ST)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 . ***Action Required*** 2241/2254 Filing Fee Not Paid. Petition not submitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 7/12/2021 to correct IFP application (Attachments: #1 2254 Petition, #2 IFP Form) **18 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)(ST)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE A 2254 PETITION, filed by Petitioner Carl Alonzo Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Carl Brooks, Prisoner ID: 259045)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carl Alonzo Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?