NEXRF Corp v. Aristocrat International Pty Limited et al
Plaintiff: NEXRF Corp
Defendant: Product Madness, Inc., Big Fish Games, Inc., Aristocrat International, Pty. Limited, Aristocrat International Pty Limited, Product Madness Inc and Big Fish Games Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00798
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER terminating #20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Alistair J. Warr filed by NEXRF Corp. The following MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez, Chief United States District Judge: On August 9, 2021, Plaintiff filed a "Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - Alastair J. Warr (Pro Hac Vice)." Dkt.20. The filing was noted as a motion and included a proposed order. The filing indicated that Plaintiff would continue to be represented by the three Folio Law Group PLLC attorneys that previously appeared in this matter. Per LCR 83.2(b)(3), "[w]here a party is represented by multiple attorneys... and one or more attorneys wish to withdraw but will not leave the client without representation, leave of the court to withdraw is not required." Accordingly, the Court terminates the motion. The Clerk shall terminate Mr. Warr's appearance. (CAO)
August 9, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Alistair J. Warr, filed by Plaintiff NEXRF Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/9/2021, (Skelley, Steven)
July 8, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff NEXRF Corp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Skelley, Steven)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re parties' #16 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Aristocrat, Big Fish, and Product Madness' answer or response to complaint deadline continued to 8/11/2021. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/25/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/1/2021, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan by 9/8/2021. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
July 7, 2021 Attorney David J Ball added as counsel for Aristocrat International Pty Limited, Big Fish Games Inc, and Product Madness Inc per #17 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
July 7, 2021 Attorneys Jared D Schuettenhelm and Patrick J. Connolly added as counsel for Aristocrat International Pty Limited, Big Fish Games Inc, and Product Madness Inc per #17 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
July 6, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas F Stewart on behalf of Defendants Aristocrat International Pty Limited, Big Fish Games Inc, Product Madness Inc. (Stewart, Douglas)
July 6, 2021 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order For Extension of Time, filed by Defendants Aristocrat International Pty Limited, Big Fish Games Inc, Product Madness Inc. Noting Date 7/6/2021, (Stewart, Douglas)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alastair James Warr for Plaintiff NEXRF Corp, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alastair J. Warr FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff NEXRF Corp (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7150801 (Skelley, Steven)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report due by 7/28/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/14/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/21/2021, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LC)
June 29, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez as related to 2:20-cv-01875-RSM. Judge Barbara J. Rothstein no longer assigned to the case. (MW)
June 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-01875, by Plaintiff NEXRF Corp. (Skelley, Steven)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR PATENT CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Craig Saunders on behalf of Plaintiff NEXRF Corp. (Saunders, Michael)
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by NEXRF Corp (Skelley, Steven)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Aristocrat International Pty Limited, Big Fish Games Inc, Product Madness Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Big Fish Games, Inc, #2 Summons Product Madness, Inc)(SR)
June 15, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) NEXRF Corp must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/22/2021. (KB)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff NEXRF Corp (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Skelley, Steven)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Cristofer Ivan Leffler on behalf of Plaintiff NEXRF Corp. (Leffler, Cristofer)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Summons Form Incomplete.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (RE)
June 14, 2021 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (RE)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO 120) by Plaintiff NEXRF Corp (Skelley, Steven)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7123426) Attorney Steven Skelley added to party NEXRF Corp(pty:pla), filed by NEXRF Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Skelley, Steven) (Attachment 5 replaced on 6/11/2021) (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEXRF Corp v. Aristocrat International Pty Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Product Madness, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Fish Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristocrat International, Pty. Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristocrat International Pty Limited
Represented By: David J Ball
Represented By: Jared D Schuettenhelm
Represented By: Patrick J. Connolly
Represented By: Douglas F Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Product Madness Inc
Represented By: David J Ball
Represented By: Jared D Schuettenhelm
Represented By: Patrick J. Connolly
Represented By: Douglas F Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Fish Games Inc
Represented By: David J Ball
Represented By: Jared D Schuettenhelm
Represented By: Patrick J. Connolly
Represented By: Douglas F Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEXRF Corp
Represented By: Steven Skelley
Represented By: Alastair James Warr
Represented By: Cristofer Ivan Leffler
Represented By: Michael Craig Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?