Demos v. State of Washington
Petitioner: John Robert Demos, Jr
Respondent: State of Washington
Case Number: 2:2021cv00834
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 USCA CASE NUMBER 21-35675 for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by John Robert Demos, Jr. **DO NOT PRINT**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(CDA)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of State of Washington against John Robert Demos, Jr. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Pursuant to the Court's Order of March 13, 1997 in case number MS97-032, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this matter. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (21-35675) by Petitioner John Robert Demos, Jr. Filing Fee Not Paid/Received. (No appealable order to link Notice of Appeal) (cc: USCA) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(SG) Modified on 8/18/2021 add CCA # (CDA).
July 17, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED Motion for Expedited Review, filed by Petitioner John Robert Demos, Jr. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST)
July 10, 2021 Filing 3 OBJECTIONS to #2 Report and Recommendations, by Petitioner John Robert Demos, Jr. Noting Date 7/30/2021. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge J Richard Creatura re #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by John Robert Demos, Jr. The parties shall have fourteen (14) days from service of this Report to file written objections and the matter is set for consideration on 7/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(KMC)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 PROPOSED Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Petitioner John Robert Demos, Jr. (Deficient - Incorrect Form) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus) **22 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(AMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demos v. State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Robert Demos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?