Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust et al v. Champion Painting Specialty Services Corp et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters Trust, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Finishing Trades Institute, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No 5, Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Western Washington Signatory Painting Employers Association, Board of Trustees of the District Council No 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust and Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, Does & Roes I-X, Champion Painting Specialty Services Corp, Washington State Department of Transportation, Old Republic Surety Company, Carlos Hernandez, Rognlins Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Rognlin's Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00858
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/7/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/23/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/30/2021. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
June 28, 2021 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SG)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Board of Trustees of the District Council No 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters Trust, Board of Trustees of the Finishing Trades Institute, Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No 5, Western Washington Signatory Painting Employers Association (Smith, Wesley)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, Champion Painting Specialty Services Corp, Does & Roes I-X, Carlos Hernandez, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Old Republic Surety Company, Rognlins Inc, Washington State Department of Transportation (Receipt # AWAWDC-7141143) Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the District Council No 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund (pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the Finishing Trades Institute (pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund (pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative(pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No 5(pty:pla), Attorney Wesley J. Smith added to party Western Washington Signatory Painting Employers Association (pty:pla), filed by Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Finishing Trades Institute, International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No 5, Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters Trust, Western Washington Signatory Painting Employers Association, Board of Trustees of the District Council No 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust et al v. Champion Painting Specialty Services Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does & Roes I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion Painting Specialty Services Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rognlins Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rognlin's Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters Trust
Represented By: Michael Urban
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative
Represented By: Michael Urban
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Finishing Trades Institute
Represented By: Michael Urban
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Painters and Allied Trades District Council No 5
Represented By: Michael Urban
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: Michael Urban
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Washington Signatory Painting Employers Association
Represented By: Michael Urban
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the District Council No 5 Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Michael Urban
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Western Washington Painters Defined Contribution Pension Trust
Represented By: Michael Urban
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Employee Painters' Trust
Represented By: Michael Urban
Represented By: Wesley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?