Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc et al v. Valve Corporation
Plaintiff: Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC, Dark Catt Studios Holdings, Inc. and Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc
Defendant: Valve Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00872
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #34 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles B Casper for Defendant Valve Corporation, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles B. Casper FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Valve Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. BWAWDC-7223030 (Skok, Gavin)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/13/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/20/2021, Joint Status Report due by 12/27/2021. (GT)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 In light of the current General Order restricting courtroom capacity to 25 people due to the highly contagious delta variant of the COVID-19 virus, the Status Conference in this matter is hereby stricken. The parties will be directed by separate entry to meet and confer and submit a joint status report.(GT)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' #26 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by August 30, 2021. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECLARATION of Joseph Bourne filed by Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc, Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC re #27 Cross MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Proposed Developer Class Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g)(3) (Jensen, Stephanie)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DECLARATION of W. Joseph Bruckner filed by Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc, Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC re #27 Cross MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Proposed Developer Class Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g)(3) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A LGN Firm Resume Leadership)(Jensen, Stephanie)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLARATION of Kenneth R. ORourke filed by Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc, Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC re #27 Cross MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Proposed Developer Class Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g)(3) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 WSGR-Biographies 08.09.2021, #2 Exhibit 2 GCR 100_16th Edition, #3 Exhibit 3 GCR 100 2021, #4 Exhibit 4 ALM Media, Finalist, Antitrust Litigation Department of the Year_WSGR, #5 Exhibit 5 WSGR A dominant firm for matters involving the hi-tech sphere, #6 Exhibit 6 WWL Ranking Kenneth R O'Rourke, #7 Exhibit 7 Global Competition Review - Washington DC antitrust bar)(Jensen, Stephanie)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Cross MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Proposed Developer Class Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g)(3), filed by Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc, Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/17/2021, (Jensen, Stephanie)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Defendant Valve Corporation. Noting Date 8/13/2021, (Skok, Gavin)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re Parties' #24 Stipulated Motion to Set Coordinated Briefing Schedule on Motion to Appoint Counsel as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Related Motion. Dark Catt's Cross-Motion and Opposition to Wolfire Plaintiffs' Motion due by 8/13/2021. Wolfire Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion and Opposition to Dark Catt's Cross-Motion due by 9/3/2021. Dark Catt's Reply in Support of Cross-Motion due by 9/17/2021. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Stipulated MOTION to Set Coordinated Briefing Schedule on Motion to Appoint Counsel as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Related Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc, Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC. Noting Date 8/9/2021, (Jensen, Stephanie)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' #22 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant must answer the complaint by August 20, 2021. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant Valve Corporation. Noting Date 7/20/2021, (Skok, Gavin)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Gabriel_Traber@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 10/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour for all further proceedings (related case 2:21-cv-563-JCC). Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, Ravi Subramanian. (KEB)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorney Laura P. Hansen added as counsel for Valve Corporation per #18 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gavin William Skok on behalf of Defendant Valve Corporation. (Skok, Gavin)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Scott A Sher for Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc, and Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Jennifer Roberson on 6/30/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc, Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC. (Jensen, Stephanie)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney William Joseph Bruckner for Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc, and Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kenneth R O'Rourke for Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc, and Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Leona Bridget Ajavon for Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc, and Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Allison B Smith for Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc, and for Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Valve Corporation (CDA)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph C Bourne for Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings, Inc., and Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge David W. Christel added. (CDA)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-00563-JCC, by Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings, Inc., Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC. (Jensen, Stephanie)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dark Catt Studios Holdings, Inc. for Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dark Catt Studios Holdings, Inc., Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC (Jensen, Stephanie)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Leona B. Ajavon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings, Inc., Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7143555 (Jensen, Stephanie)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph C. Bourne FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings, Inc., Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7143550 (Jensen, Stephanie)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY W. Joseph Bruckner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings, Inc., Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7143549 (Jensen, Stephanie)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Allison B. Smith FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings, Inc., Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7143545 (Jensen, Stephanie)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Scott A. Sher FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings, Inc., Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7143539 (Jensen, Stephanie)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kenneth R. ORourke FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings, Inc., Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7143524 (Jensen, Stephanie)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR VIOLATION OF SECTION 2 OF THE SHERMAN ACT (15 U.S.C. 2) AND WASHINGTON CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT against defendant(s) Valve Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7143411), filed by Dark Catt Studios Holdings, Inc., Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Jensen, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc et al v. Valve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valve Corporation
Represented By: Charles B Casper
Represented By: Laura P. Hansen
Represented By: Gavin William Skok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Represented By: Allison B Smith
Represented By: Joseph C Bourne
Represented By: Kenneth R O'Rourke
Represented By: Leona Bridget Ajavon
Represented By: Scott A Sher
Represented By: William Joseph Bruckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dark Catt Studios Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc
Represented By: Allison B Smith
Represented By: Joseph C Bourne
Represented By: Kenneth R O'Rourke
Represented By: Leona Bridget Ajavon
Represented By: Scott A Sher
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Jensen
Represented By: William Joseph Bruckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?