Greenberg et al v. Amazon.com Inc
Plaintiff: Alvin Greenberg, Michael Steinberg and Julie Hanson
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00898
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rachel S Brass for Defendant Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Benjamin Siegel for plaintiffs Alvin Greenberg, Julie Hanson and Michael Steinberg, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph Rose for defendant Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ben Harrington for plaintiffs Alvin Greenberg, Julie Hanson and Michael Steinberg, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristin Andrea Linsley for Defendant Amazon.com Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 5, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph R. Rose FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7198398 (Rummage, Stephen)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rachel S. Brass FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7198396 (Rummage, Stephen)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristin A. Linsley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Amazon.com Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7198333 (Rummage, Stephen)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' #6 Stipulated Motion and [Proposed] Order Extending Responsive Pleading Deadline and Setting Briefing Schedule. Amazon's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be 10/1/2021. Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss shall be 11/5/2021. Amazon's deadline to file any reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss shall be 11/19/2021. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
August 4, 2021 Attorneys James E Howard and Sarah Cox added for Amazon.com Inc; per #7 Notice of Appearance. (LH)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephen M Rummage on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Rummage, Stephen)
August 4, 2021 NOTE: Document #6 was filed incorrectly/improperly. Appearances of attorneys Stephen M. Rummage, James E. Howard, and Sarah E. Cox are not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (LH) (cc: Attorneys Rummage, Howard, and Cox via ECF ad hoc)
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Extending Responsive Pleading Deadline and Setting Briefing Schedule, filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc. Noting Date 8/3/2021, (Rummage, Stephen)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Benjamin J. Siegel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Alvin Greenberg, Julie Hanson, Michael Steinberg (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7186111 (Berman, Steve)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ben Harrington FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Alvin Greenberg, Julie Hanson, Michael Steinberg (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7186107 (Berman, Steve)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Amazon.com Inc mailed on 7/2/2021 (Berman, Steve)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Amazon.com Inc. (RE)
July 6, 2021 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (RE)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against defendant(s) Amazon.com, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7151466) Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Alvin Greenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Julie Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Michael Steinberg(pty:pla), filed by Alvin Greenberg, Julie Hanson, Michael Steinberg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Berman, Steve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenberg et al v. Amazon.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Greenberg
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Ben Harrington
Represented By: Benjamin Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Steinberg
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Ben Harrington
Represented By: Benjamin Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Hanson
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Ben Harrington
Represented By: Benjamin Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Joseph Rose
Represented By: Kristin Andrea Linsley
Represented By: Rachel S Brass
Represented By: Sarah Cox
Represented By: James E Howard
Represented By: Stephen M Rummage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?