Holub v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Adria Holub
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00899
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration on 7/20/2021, filed by Plaintiff Adria Holub. (Dellert, Christopher)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (DK)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Adria Holub.(DK)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by Judge J Richard Creatura, re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (DK)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER NOT TO PROVIDE COURTESY COPIES OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD: The Administration should not file a paper or CD courtesy copy of the Administrative Record for chambers in this matter. This does not modify the procedure for any other chambers. Signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT filed by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KAM)
July 7, 2021 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SG)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:13-cv-159, 2:15-cv-706, by Plaintiff Adria Holub. (Dellert, Christopher)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Adria Holub. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons)(Dellert, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holub v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adria Holub
Represented By: Christopher H Dellert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?