Kessler v. Ta et al
Plaintiff: Robert Kessler
Defendant: Peter H Ta and 999 Restaurant Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00911
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12112
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 30 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Robert Kessler (Judnich, M. William)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Derek C Butz for Plaintiff Robert Kessler. (Butz, Derek)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney M. William Judnich on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Kessler. (Judnich, M. William)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik for all further proceedings. Judge Barbara J. Rothstein no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SG)
July 9, 2021 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SG)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiff Robert Kessler. (Butz, Derek)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7156744) Attorney Derek C Butz added to party Robert Kessler(pty:pla), filed by Robert Kessler. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Butz, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kessler v. Ta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kessler
Represented By: Derek C Butz
Represented By: M. William Judnich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter H Ta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 999 Restaurant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?