Driveline Baseball Enterprises LLC v. Top Velocity LLC et al
Petitioner: Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC and Driveline Baseball Enterprises LLC
Respondent: Top Velocity, LLC, Brent Pourciau and Top Velocity LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00946
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY, filed by Petitioner Driveline Baseball Enterprises LLC, TO RESPONSE to re #1 Petition (Other) NOTED on motion calendar; (Peterson, Tyler)
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Petition (Other) by Brent Pourciau, Top Velocity LLC.(Bardwil, Mark)
July 28, 2021 *** Set Noting Date: #1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award is noted for 8/20/2021, pursuant to #10 NOTICE OF MOTION REGARDING DRIVELINE'S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD. (VE)
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: Filed by Petitioner Driveline Baseball Enterprises LLC. Noting Date 8/20/2021, (Peterson, Tyler)
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Top Velocity LLC (Bardwil, Mark)
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark Edward Bardwil on behalf of Respondent Brent Pourciau. (Bardwil, Mark)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark Edward Bardwil on behalf of Respondent Top Velocity LLC. (Bardwil, Mark)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Top Velocity, LLC on 7/16/2021, filed by Petitioner Driveline Baseball Enterprises LLC. (Peterson, Tyler)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Brent Pourciau on 7/16/2021, filed by Petitioner Driveline Baseball Enterprises LLC. (Peterson, Tyler)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Driveline Baseball Enterprises LLC (Peterson, Tyler)
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian.. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones for all further proceedings. Hon. Michelle L. Peterson no longer assigned to case. (TF)
July 16, 2021 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (CDA)
July 16, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Petitioner Driveline Baseball Enterprises LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/23/2021. (CDA)
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Tyler C. Peterson re #1 Petition (Other) by Petitioner Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Peterson, Tyler)
July 15, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Receipt # AWAWDC-7167858), filed by Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peterson, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Driveline Baseball Enterprises LLC v. Top Velocity LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Driveline Baseball Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Tyler C Peterson
Represented By: James Wayne Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Driveline Baseball Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Tyler C Peterson
Represented By: James Wayne Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Top Velocity, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brent Pourciau
Represented By: Mark Edward Bardwil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Top Velocity LLC
Represented By: Mark Edward Bardwil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?