CN Romtehnica SA v. PW Arms Inc
Petitioner: Romtehnica, S.A. and CN Romtehnica SA
Respondent: PW Arms, Inc. and PW Arms Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00953
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Respondent P.W. Arms, Inc.'s Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, filed by Respondent PW Arms Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/24/2021, (Weythman, Rylan)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/13/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/20/2021, Joint Status Report due by 12/27/2021. (GT)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 In light of the current General Order restricting courtroom capacity to 25 people due to the highly contagious delta variant of the COVID-19 virus, the Status Conference in this matter is hereby stricken. The parties will be directed by separate entry to meet and confer and submit a joint status report. (GT)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rylan L. S. Weythman on behalf of Respondent PW Arms Inc. (Weythman, Rylan)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorney Bianca G Chamusco added for PW Arms Inc; per #11 Notice of Appearance. (SR)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on P.W. Arms, Inc. on 8/4/2021, filed by Petitioner CN Romtehnica SA. (Weiskopf, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CN Romtehnica SA (Weiskopf, Elizabeth)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) PW Arms Inc. (SR)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Petitioner CN Romtehnica SA (Weiskopf, Elizabeth)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Gabriel_Traber@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 10/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Summons Form Incomplete.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ioana Salajanu for Petitioner Romtehnica, S.A., by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Petitioner CN Romtehnica SA must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/26/2021. (RE)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (RE)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ioana Salajanu FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Petitioner Romtehnica, S.A. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7169247 (Weiskopf, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Foreign Arbitral Award (Receipt # AWAWDC-7169134), filed by Romtehnica, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A Declaration of Razvan Mincu, #5 Exhibit 1 Ex 1 to Exhibit A-Proforma Agreement_Redacted, #6 Exhibit Ex 2 to Exhibit A-Addendum_Redacted, #7 Exhibit Ex 3 to Exhibit A-Remedial Agreement_Redacted, #8 Exhibit Ex 4 to Exhibit A-Addendum to Remedial Agreement_Redacted, #9 Exhibit Ex 5 to Exhibit A-Commercial Invoice Certified_Redacted, #10 Exhibit Ex 6 to Exhibit A-Arbitral Award - Romanian, #11 Exhibit Ex 7 to Exhibit A-Arbitral Award - English, #12 Exhibit Ex 8 to Exhibit A-Notice of Award, #13 Exhibit Ex 9 to Exhibit A-Civil Decision 39 in English and Romanian, #14 Exhibit Ex 10 to Exhibit A-Decision No. 1777 in English and Romanian, #15 Exhibit Report of Ruxandra-Elena Ghidiu)(Weiskopf, Elizabeth) (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten malformed PDF on 7/16/2021) (STP). Modified on 7/19/2021 to edit document titles. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CN Romtehnica SA v. PW Arms Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Romtehnica, S.A.
Represented By: Elizabeth J Weiskopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CN Romtehnica SA
Represented By: Elizabeth J Weiskopf
Represented By: Ioana Salajanu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PW Arms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PW Arms Inc
Represented By: Bianca G Chamusco
Represented By: Rylan L. S. Weythman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?