QuoteWizard.com LLC v. RevPoint Media LLC et al
Plaintiff: QuoteWizard.com, LLC and QuoteWizard.com LLC
Defendant: RevPoint Media, LLC and RevPoint Media LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01043
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 15 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant RevPoint Media LLC on 8/23/2021 (Kingston, Christine)
August 17, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant RevPoint Media LLC. (AQ)
August 16, 2021 Filing 13 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff QuoteWizard.com LLC (Cosgrove, Philip)
August 12, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent LendingTree, LLC for QuoteWizard.com LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by QuoteWizard.com LLC (Cosgrove, Philip)
August 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, case number(s) in other court 1:19-cv-12235-LTS ; filed by Plaintiff QuoteWizard.com LLC. (Cosgrove, Philip)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christine M Kingston for Plaintiff QuoteWizard.com LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Application. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kevin P Polansky for Plaintiff QuoteWizard.com LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachel Tallon Reynolds on behalf of Plaintiff QuoteWizard.com LLC. (Reynolds, Rachel)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christine M. Kingston FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff QuoteWizard.com LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7203413 (Reynolds, Rachel)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin P. Polansky FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Plaintiff QuoteWizard.com LLC. Receipt No. AWAWDC-7199506 (Reynolds, Rachel)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Philip R Cosgrove on behalf of Plaintiff QuoteWizard.com LLC. (Cosgrove, Philip)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 ** Reminder ** Documents omitted Notice of Pendency of Other Action.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Philip R Cosgrove on behalf of Plaintiff QuoteWizard.com LLC. (Cosgrove, Philip)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kevin P. Polansky FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff QuoteWizard.com LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7199506 (Polansky, Kevin) Filed by Philip R. Cosgrove. 8/9/2021 (DS).
August 5, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff QuoteWizard.com LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/12/2021. (RE)
August 5, 2021 Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (RE)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) RevPoint Media, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # BWAWDC-7196295), filed by QuoteWizard.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cosgrove, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QuoteWizard.com LLC v. RevPoint Media LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QuoteWizard.com, LLC
Represented By: Philip R Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QuoteWizard.com LLC
Represented By: Christine M Kingston
Represented By: Kevin P Polansky
Represented By: Philip R Cosgrove
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RevPoint Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RevPoint Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?