Hovander v. Sortis Income Fund LLC et al
Plaintiff: Guy Hovander
Defendant: Sortis Income Fund LLC and Does 1-20
Case Number: 2:2021cv01077
Filed: August 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Sortis Income Fund LLC(SG)
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Sortis Income Fund LLC, Does 1-20 with JURY DEMAND, filed by Guy Hovander.(Creed, Joseph) Modified on 8/16/2021 to add additional party filing is against (KB).
August 13, 2021 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SG)
August 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Sortis Income Fund, LLC, Does 1-20 with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7205458), filed by Guy Hovander. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Creed, Joseph) Modified on 8/16/2021 to add additional party filing is against (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hovander v. Sortis Income Fund LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Hovander
Represented By: Joseph W Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sortis Income Fund LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?