Securities and Exchange Commission v. Jun et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Sung Mo Jun, Joon Jun, Junwoo Chon, Ayden Lee, Jae Hyeon Bae and Joon Mo Jun
Case Number: 2:2021cv01108
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 24 FINAL JUDGMENT as to Defendant Jae Hyeon Bae (VE)
September 2, 2021 Filing 23 JUDGMENT as to Defendant Ayden Lee (VE)
September 2, 2021 Filing 22 JUDGMENT as to Defendant Junwoo Chon (VE)
September 2, 2021 Filing 21 JUDGMENT as to Defendant Joon Mo Jun (VE)
September 2, 2021 Filing 20 JUDGMENT as to Defendant Sung Mo Jun (VE)
August 26, 2021 Attorneys Todd T Williams, Byung-Hee Keum added for Joon Mo Jun, per #19 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
August 26, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven W Fogg on behalf of Defendant Joon Mo Jun. (Fogg, Steven)
August 25, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission re #2 MOTION for Judgment as to Sung Mo Jun, #5 MOTION for Judgment as to Ayden Lee, #4 MOTION for Judgment as to Junwoo Chon, #6 MOTION for Judgment as to Jae Hyeon Bae, #3 MOTION for Judgment as to Joon Jun (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
August 24, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jae Hyeon Bae mailed on 8/20/2021 (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
August 24, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven D Buchholz on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Buchholz, Steven)
August 23, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Sung Mo Jun mailed on 8/20/2021 (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
August 23, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Ayden Lee mailed on 8/20/2021 (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Junwoo Chon mailed on 8/20/2021 (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Joon Mo Jun mailed on 8/20/2021 (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cr-00135-RAJ, by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher R Black on behalf of Defendant Junwoo Chon. (Black, Christopher)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s), Notice of Related Cases Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 8/24/2021. (RE)
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Jae Hyeon Bae, Junwoo Chon, Joon Mo Jun, Sung Mo Jun, Ayden Lee. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(RE)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Harold A Malkin on behalf of Defendant Sung Mo Jun. (Malkin, Harold)
August 19, 2021 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (RE)
August 19, 2021 Attorney Henry Charles Phillips added for Sung Mo Jun; per #7 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment as to Jae Hyeon Bae, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Jae Hyeon Bae) Noting Date 8/31/2021, (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Judgment as to Ayden Lee, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Ayden Lee) Noting Date 8/31/2021, (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Judgment as to Junwoo Chon, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Junwoo Chon) Noting Date 8/31/2021, (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Judgment as to Joon Jun, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Joon Jun) Noting Date 8/31/2021, (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Judgment as to Sung Mo Jun, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Defendant Sung Mo Jun) Noting Date 8/31/2021, (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Rahul Kolhatkar added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla), filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Kolhatkar, Rahul) (No Fee Required)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Jun et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Steven D Buchholz
Represented By: Rahul Kolhatkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sung Mo Jun
Represented By: Harold A Malkin
Represented By: Henry Charles Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joon Jun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Junwoo Chon
Represented By: Christopher R Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayden Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jae Hyeon Bae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joon Mo Jun
Represented By: Byung-Hee Keum
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Todd T Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?