Markel American Insurance Company v. Islands Marine Center Inc
Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company and Mark Lindstrom
Defendant: Islands Marine Center, Inc. and Islands Marine Center Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01115
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the joint request of counsel and for good cause shown, the deadlines set by the Court's ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT (Dkt #5) are continued as follows: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/9/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/16/2021, Joint Status Report due by 11/23/2021. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LC)
September 21, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #7 Waiver of Service : Modified on 9/21/2021 to update date that Waiver of Service was mailed to 09/08/2021. (KB)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Islands Marine Center Inc mailed on 9/20/2021 9/08/2021 (Jones, Jeremy) Modified on 9/21/2021 to update date that Waiver of Service was mailed (KB).
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Harrison Walsh on behalf of Defendant Islands Marine Center Inc. (Walsh, William)
September 8, 2021 Attorney Robert D Lee added as counsel for Islands Marine Center Inc per #6 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 10/12/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/28/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/5/2021. (LC)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Jeremy Jones on behalf of Plaintiff Markel American Insurance Company. (Jones, Jeremy)
August 27, 2021 Attorney Elizabeth Strunk added as counsel for Markel American Insurance Company per #4 Notice of Attorney Association. (PM)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Islands Marine Center Inc. (RE)
August 20, 2021 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Markel American Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mark Lindstrom, Markel American Insurance Company (Jones, Jeremy)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Islands Marine Center, Inc. (Receipt # AWAWDC-7215242) Attorney Jeremy Jones added to party Mark Lindstrom(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy Jones added to party Markel American Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Markel American Insurance Company, Mark Lindstrom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Jones, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markel American Insurance Company v. Islands Marine Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeremy Jones
Represented By: Elizabeth Strunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Lindstrom
Represented By: Jeremy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islands Marine Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islands Marine Center Inc
Represented By: Robert D Lee
Represented By: William Harrison Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?