Norris et al v. T-Mobile USA Inc
Plaintiff: Randall Norris and Misty Norris
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01153
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Name ; filed by Plaintiffs Misty Norris, Randall Norris. (Lynch, Gary)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #25 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney MaryBeth V. Gibson for plaintiffs Misty Norris and Randall Norris, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #30 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rachel Kristine Tack for Plaintiff Misty Norris and Randall Norris, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #29 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael J Laird for Plaintiffs Misty Norris and Randall Norris, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #28 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian C Gudmundson for Plaintiffs Misty Norris and Randall Norris, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 6, 2021 Filing 30 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rachel K. Tack FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Misty Norris, Randall Norris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7280010 (Sargent, Anne-Marie)
October 6, 2021 Filing 29 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael J. Laird FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Misty Norris, Randall Norris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7280003 (Sargent, Anne-Marie)
October 6, 2021 Filing 28 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian C. Gudmundson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Misty Norris, Randall Norris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7279998 (Sargent, Anne-Marie)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND SECOND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re Parties' #26 Stipulated Motion. T-Mobile's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is continued until 14 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") rules on the pending motion to transfer related cases for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SR)
October 5, 2021 Filing 26 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve)
October 4, 2021 Filing 25 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY MaryBeth V. Gibson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Misty Norris, Randall Norris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7275493 (Sargent, Anne-Marie)
September 29, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Derik Ramon Campos and Stephen P Connor for Plaintiffs Misty Norris, Randall Norris. (Sargent, Anne-Marie)
September 23, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-01118 2:21-cv-01119 2:21-cv-01130 2:21-cv-01137 2:21-cv-01138 2:21-cv-01139 2:21-cv-01148 2:21-cv-01157 2:21-cv-01161 2:21-cv-01169 2:21-cv-01179 2:21-cv-01181 2:21-cv-01183 2:21-cv-01189 2:21-cv-01190 2:21-cv-01208 2:21-cv-01226 2:21-cv-01245 2:21-cv-01250 2:21-cv-01266, by Plaintiffs Misty Norris, Randall Norris. (Attachments: #1 List of Related Cases)(Sargent, Anne-Marie)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Parties' #19 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #20 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown for defendant T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(STP)
September 16, 2021 Filing 20 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kristine McAlister Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7253187 (Koh, Steve)
September 16, 2021 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION and Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve)
September 16, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by T-Mobile USA Inc (Koh, Steve)
September 16, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steve Y Koh on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve)
September 16, 2021 Attorneys Kathleen M O'Sullivan and Lauren Jeffers Tsuji added for T-Mobile USA Inc; per #17 Notice of Appearance. (SR)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nicholas A Colella for Plaintiff Misty Norris and Randall Norris, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gary F Lynch for Plaintiffs Misty Norris and for Randall Norris, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gary F. Lynch FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Misty Norris, Randall Norris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7243135 (Sargent, Anne-Marie)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nicholas A. Colella FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Misty Norris, Randall Norris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7243121 (Sargent, Anne-Marie)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on T-Mobile USA Inc on 9/2/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Misty Norris, Randall Norris. (Sargent, Anne-Marie)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Carey Alexander for Plaintiffs Misty Norris and Randall Norris, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Erin Green Comite for Plaintiffs Misty Norris and Randall Norris, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph P Guglielmo for Plaintiffs Misty Norris and Randall Norris, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Carey Alexander FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Misty Norris, Randall Norris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7233185 (Sargent, Anne-Marie)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Erin Green Comite FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Misty Norris, Randall Norris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7233176 (Sargent, Anne-Marie)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph P. Guglielmo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Misty Norris, Randall Norris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7233163 (Sargent, Anne-Marie)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: This case is hereby transferred to the Honorable Barbara J. Rothstein. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C21-1153BJR. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) T-Mobile USA Inc (SG)
August 27, 2021 Judge James L. Robart added. (SG)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Misty Norris, Randall Norris (Sargent, Anne-Marie)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class action) against defendant(s) T-Mobile USA, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7224800) Attorney Anne-Marie E Sargent added to party Misty Norris(pty:pla), Attorney Anne-Marie E Sargent added to party Randall Norris(pty:pla), filed by Randall Norris, Misty Norris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sargent, Anne-Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norris et al v. T-Mobile USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Norris
Represented By: Anne-Marie E Sargent
Represented By: Brian C Gudmundson
Represented By: Carey Alexander
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: MaryBeth V. Gibson
Represented By: Michael J Laird
Represented By: Derik Ramon Campos
Represented By: Stephen P Connor
Represented By: Nicholas A Colella
Represented By: Rachel Kristine Tack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Norris
Represented By: Anne-Marie E Sargent
Represented By: Brian C Gudmundson
Represented By: Carey Alexander
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: MaryBeth V. Gibson
Represented By: Michael J Laird
Represented By: Nicholas A Colella
Represented By: Rachel Kristine Tack
Represented By: Derik Ramon Campos
Represented By: Stephen P Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Inc
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Represented By: Kathleen M O'Sullivan
Represented By: Lauren Jeffers Tsuji
Represented By: Steve Y Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?