Ohio Security Insurance Company v. Broan-NuTone LLC
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Defendant: Broan-NuTone LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01162
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 4 days. JURY TRIAL is set for 4/10/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 12/20/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 10/12/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/12/2022, Discovery completed by 12/12/2022, Dispositive motions and motions challenging expert witness testimony due by 1/10/2023, Motions in Limine due by 3/13/2023, Pretrial Order due by 3/27/2023, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 4/3/2023, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
September 20, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company (Smith, Kevin)
September 20, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kevin F Smith on behalf of Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Smith, Kevin)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alletta S Brenner for defendant Broan-NuTone LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(STP)
September 16, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alletta Brenner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Broan-NuTone LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7252626 (Rosencrans, Todd)
September 16, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: four. (Rosencrans, Todd)
September 15, 2021 Reset Deadline: Upon the joint request of the parties, the deadline to exchange initial disclosures is extended to 10/6/2021. (VE)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/15/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/22/2021, Joint Status Report due by 9/29/2021, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nortek, Inc. for Broan-NuTone LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Broan-NuTone LLC (Rosencrans, Todd)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Broan-NuTone LLC (Rosencrans, Todd)
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Attorney Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (Notice sent to counsel via ad hoc) (RE)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required***See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
August 31, 2021 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (RE)
August 31, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Ohio Security Insurance Company and Defendant Broan-Nutone LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/7/2021. (RE)
August 31, 2021 Attorney Lisa A Liekhus terminated per Withdrawal Notice in State court documents. (RE)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Broan-NuTone LLC (Rosencrans, Todd)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiff re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Broan-NuTone LLC. (Rosencrans, Todd)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Todd W. Rosencrans re Notice to State Court Clerk re Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Broan-NuTone LLC (Rosencrans, Todd)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 20-2-05061-31; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7226449) Attorney Todd W Rosencrans added to party Broan-NuTone LLC(pty:dft), filed by Broan-NuTone LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Demand Letter, #3 Complaint (Ex. 2), #4 Exhibit 3 - 2021-07-29 Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit 4 - Corporate Information-Ohio Security Inc. Co.)(Rosencrans, Todd) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/27/2021 - flatten PDF) (MET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Security Insurance Company v. Broan-NuTone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa A Liekhus
Represented By: Kevin F Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-NuTone LLC
Represented By: Todd W Rosencrans
Represented By: Alletta S Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?