Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Expeditors International of Washington Inc
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Expeditors International of Washington Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01184
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1300
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/18/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/25/2022, Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2022.(GT)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Steven William Block added to party Expeditors International of Washington Inc(pty:dft) by Expeditors International of Washington Inc.(Block, Steven)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Expeditors International of Washington Inc (Block, Steven)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Reno, Vi)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Expeditors International of Washington Inc. (RE)
September 1, 2021 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (RE)
September 1, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Travelers Property Casualty Company of America must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/8/2021. (RE)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Money Damages for Damage to Cargo against defendant(s) Expeditors International of Washington Inc (Receipt # AWAWDC-7231520) Attorney Vi Jean Reno added to party Travelers Property Casualty Company of America(pty:pla), filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reno, Vi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Expeditors International of Washington Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Vi Jean Reno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expeditors International of Washington Inc
Represented By: Steven William Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?